EP2898157 - BUILDING BOARD AND METHOD OF MOUNTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oneday Wall AB Forskarvägen 1 702 18 Örebro / SE | [2017/47] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states Oneday Wall AB Inkubera Forskarvägen 1 702 18 Örebro / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBERG, Peter Smedstorpsvägen 7 SE-702 30 Örebro / SE | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Bjerkén Hynell KB Tulegatan 53 113 53 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB (Stockholm) Box 5366 102 49 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2015/31] | Wihlsson, Joakim Per Magnus Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O. Box 5366 102 49 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13840015.5 | 16.09.2013 | [2018/13] | WO2013SE51074 | Priority number, date | SE20120051040 | 18.09.2012 Original published format: SE 1251040 | [2015/31] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014046597 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2898157 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2898157 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/40, E04B2/74, E04B2/78, E04B2/80, E04F13/08, E04F13/26, E04F15/02 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
E04C2/40 (EP,RU,SE,US);
E04F13/0894 (RU,US);
E04B2/789 (SE);
E04B2/80 (SE);
E04F13/26 (RU,US);
E04F15/02038 (RU,US);
E04B2/7457 (EP,US);
E04B2002/7462 (SE);
E04C2002/004 (SE);
E04F13/0826 (EP,US);
E04F13/083 (SE);
E04F13/0846 (SE);
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | E04C2/40, E04B2/74, E04B2/78, E04B2/80, E04F13/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE | [2015/31] | English: | BUILDING BOARD AND METHOD OF MOUNTING | [2015/31] | French: | PANNEAU DE CONSTRUCTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 10.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2013 | AL | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | HR | 28.03.2018 | LT | 28.03.2018 | LV | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | MK | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | RS | 28.03.2018 | SE | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SK | 28.03.2018 | SM | 28.03.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | GR | 29.06.2018 | IS | 28.07.2018 | PT | 30.07.2018 | IE | 16.09.2018 | LU | 16.09.2018 | MT | 16.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.09.2013 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MK | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
MT | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.09.2013 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
MT | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
MT | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 16.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | HR | 28.03.2018 | |
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | HR | 28.03.2018 | |
LT | 28.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE20200268U (HUELSTA WERKE HUELS KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,9,12 * page 1, paragraph 2; figure 2 * * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 14, paragraph 1 * [Y] 3,5-7,10 [I] 8,11,13-15; | [Y]US2004211144 (STANCHFIELD OLIVER O [US]) [Y] 3,5-7 * paragraph [0071]; figures 2-3 *; | [XYI]WO2011006813 (AKZENTA PANEELE & PROFILE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,12 * page 5, lines 25-31; figures 1a-1d, 4, 4a, 12 * * page 14, line 8 - page 15, line 30 * * page 29, lines 3-9 * [Y] 3,5-7,10 [I] 8,11,13-15; | [Y]WO2012112110 (LINDBERG FOERVALTNING AB P [SE], et al) [Y] 10* page 1, lines 9-11 * | International search | [A]SE445476 (DISEN SVEN RUNE); | [A]GB2216918 (WARD BUILDING SYSTEMS LTD [GB]); | [A]WO9606241 (GILL NORMAN DOUGLAS [GB]); | [A]US2006010820 (SCHWITTE RICHARD [DE], et al); | [A]WO2010044728 (LINDBERG PETER [SE]) | by applicant | DE20200268U | US2006010820 | WO2010044728 | WO2011006813 |