|
12.09.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.09.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2014 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2014 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
54 |