Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9602516 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2017 | B2 | US2015113591 | 23.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201210362545 | 25.09.2012 | WO2013CN84116 | 24.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101825781B | Global Dossier | 05.02.2018 | B1 | KR20150010988 | 29.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210362545 | 25.09.2012 | WO2013CN84116 | 24.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5909597B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2016 | B2 | JP2015519852 | 09.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210362545 | 25.09.2012 | WO2013CN84116 | 24.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2849411 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2017 | B1 | EP2849411 | 03.06.2015 | A4 | EP2849411 | 18.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201210362545 | 25.09.2012 | WO2013CN84116 | 24.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014032981 | 27.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CN201210362545 | 25.09.2012 | WO2013CN84116 | 24.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX342518 | 03.10.2016 | B | MX2014015354 | 05.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210362545 | 25.09.2012 | WO2013CN84116 | 24.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2604418 | 10.12.2016 | C2 | RU2014153908 | 20.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210362545 | 25.09.2012 | WO2013CN84116 | 24.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014048305 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201210362545 | 25.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102904936B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2015 | B | CN102904936 | 30.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210362545 | 25.09.2012 |