Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9426859 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2016 | B2 | US2016037592 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CN78967 | 08.07.2013 | CN201210362539 | 26.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2890222 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2019 | B1 | EP2890222 | 20.04.2016 | A4 | EP2890222 | 01.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CN78967 | 08.07.2013 | CN201210362539 | 26.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014048157 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201210362539 | 26.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102932989B | Global Dossier | 24.07.2013 | B | CN102932989 | 13.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210362539 | 26.09.2012 |