EP2901475 - METHOD FOR FORMING A THROUGH-SILICON VIA BY ELECTROLESS METAL DEPOSITION, AND CORRESPONDING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/32] | ELECTROLESS METAL THROUGH SILICON VIA | ||
[2019/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silex Microsystems AB P O Box 595 175 26 Järfälla / SE | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBEFORS, Thorbjörn Kallkärrsvägen 28 S-141 41 Huddinge / SE | 02 /
KNUTSSON, Henrik Pipers Backe 12 S-593 38 Västervik / SE | [2015/35] |
Former [2015/32] | 01 /
EBEFORS, Thorbjörn Kallkärrsvägen 28 S-141 41 Huddinge / SE | ||
02 /
KNUTSSON, Henrik Hamngatan 39A S-593 33 Västervik / SE | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Drottninggatan 27 103 59 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2015/32] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13841291.1 | 27.09.2013 | [2020/09] | WO2013SE51124 | Priority number, date | SE20120051089 | 27.09.2012 Original published format: SE 1251089 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014051511 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2901475 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2901475 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/48, H01L21/768, H01L23/48, H01L23/498, // H01L21/288 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
H01L21/76898 (EP,SE,US);
H01L21/76897 (US);
H01L21/0217 (US);
H01L21/02381 (US);
H01L21/02532 (US);
H01L21/02595 (US);
H01L21/288 (EP,US);
H01L21/486 (EP,SE,US);
H01L21/76847 (US);
H01L21/76874 (EP,SE,US);
H01L21/76879 (US);
H01L21/76888 (US);
H01L21/76892 (US);
H01L23/481 (EP,US);
H01L23/49827 (EP,SE,US);
H01L23/5384 (SE);
H01L2224/02372 (EP,US);
H01L2224/02375 (EP,US);
H01L2224/03462 (EP,US);
H01L2224/03464 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05008 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05009 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05155 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05548 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05647 (EP,US);
H01L2224/06181 (EP,US);
H01L2224/27462 (SE);
H01L2224/27825 (SE);
H01L23/49838 (EP,US);
H01L24/03 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP,US);
H01L24/06 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/18] | H01L21/768, H01L23/48 | ||
Former IPC [2015/32] | H01L21/768, H01L23/48, H01L23/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SILIZIUMDURCHKONTAKTIERUNG DURCH STROMLOSE METALLABSCHEIDUNG, UND ZUGEHÖRIGES HALBLEITERBAUELELEMNT | [2019/34] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A THROUGH-SILICON VIA BY ELECTROLESS METAL DEPOSITION, AND CORRESPONDING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE INTERCONNEXION VERTICALE TRAVERSANTE PAR DÉPÔT AUTOCATALYTIQUE DE MÉTAL, ET DISPOSITIF SEMICONDUCTEUR CORRESPONDANT | [2019/34] |
Former [2015/32] | STROMLOSE METALLBOHRUNG DURCH EINEN SILICIUMDURCHGANG | ||
Former [2015/32] | ELECTROLESS METAL THROUGH SILICON VIA | ||
Former [2015/32] | TROU D'INTERCONNEXION DE SILICIUM TRAVERSANT UN MÉTAL AUTOCATALYTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 29.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2019 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2013 | AL | 26.02.2020 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | IE | 27.09.2020 | LU | 27.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5608264 (GAUL STEPHEN J [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 9, line 25 - column 10, line 24; figures 4.11-4.14 *; | [XAY]US2005150683 (FARNWORTH WARREN M [US], et al) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0026] - [0047]; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-12 [Y] 15; | [A]US2006043598 (KIRBY KYLE K [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0088] - [0100]; figures 3A-3E *; | [XY]US2009160058 (KUO CHEN-CHENG [TW], et al) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0023] - [0033]; figures 3-9 * [Y] 15; | [X]EP2500930 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0040] - [0046] - [0 55]; figures 3, 6, 7 * | International search | [A]US6180523 (LEE CHWAN-YING [TW], et al); | [A]US2004203224 (HALAHAN PATRICK A [US], et al); | [A]WO2007089206 (SILEX MICROSYSTEMS AB [SE], et al); | [A]US2012153477 (SHEN HONG [US]); | [A] - INOUE, F ET AL., "Study of low resistance TSV using electroless plated copper and tungsten-alloy barrier", INTERCONNECT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2009. IITC 2009., (20090601), pages 167 - 168, XP031477569 | by applicant | US2002179921 | US7276789 | EP1987535 | WO2010059188 | WO2010133550 | - RICHARD et al., "Barrier and Copper Seed Layer Wet Etching", Solid State Phenomena, (20050000), vol. 103-104, pages 361 - 364 |