EP2900997 - TURBOMACHINE THRUST REVERSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUKEISEN, Robert L. 1458 Randolph Road Middletown, Connecticut 06457 / US | 02 /
MERCIER, Claude 193 Talcott Ridge Road South Windsor, Connecticut 06074 / US | 03 /
MALECKI, Robert E. 431 S. Eagleville Road Storrs, Connecticut 06268 / US | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13841868.6 | 16.09.2013 | WO2013US59878 | Priority number, date | US201261706820P | 28.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261706820 P | US201213712240 | 12.12.2012 Original published format: US201213712240 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014052061 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2900997 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/62, B64D33/04 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
F02K1/64 (EP,US);
F02K1/58 (US);
B64D29/06 (EP,US);
F02C7/20 (EP,US);
F02K1/72 (US);
F05D2250/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Title | German: | SCHUBUMKEHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR TURBOMASCHINE | [2015/32] | English: | TURBOMACHINE THRUST REVERSER | [2015/32] | French: | INVERSEUR DE POUSSÉE DE TURBOMACHINE | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 09.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/49] | 27.10.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2017 | 27.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009301056 (HATRICK MICHAEL JOHN [GB]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0039]; figure - *; | [X]EP2333282 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0034]; figure - *; | [X]US2012023901 (GILSON JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0053]; figure - * | International search | [A]US5943856 (LILLIBRIDGE ROBERT W [US], et al); | [X]US2009301056 (HATRICK MICHAEL JOHN [GB]); | [A]US2010115958 (PARHAM DEAN L [US]); | [A]US2010126139 (HOWE MARK E [US]); | [A]US2010212286 (WEST RANDALL R [US], et al) | by applicant | US2009301056 | EP2333282 | US2012023901 |