|
19.05.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.06.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.02.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
05.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
28.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2014 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
59 |