Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10231144 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2019 | B2 | US2015098346 | 09.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CN82044 | 22.08.2013 | CN201210370539 | 28.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6349301B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2018 | B2 | JP2015519804 | 09.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013CN82044 | 22.08.2013 | CN201210370539 | 28.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2827518 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2020 | B1 | EP2827518 | 14.10.2015 | A4 | EP2827518 | 21.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CN82044 | 22.08.2013 | CN201210370539 | 28.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014048189 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201210370539 | 28.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103716116B | Global Dossier | 16.04.2019 | B | CN103716116 | 09.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210370539 | 28.09.2012 |