EP2901544 - DROOP COMPENSATION USING CURRENT FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NantEnergy, Inc. 8455 North 90th Street, Suite 4 Scottsdale, AZ 85258 / US | [2018/42] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Fluidic, Inc. 8455 North 90th Street Suite 4 Scottsdale, AZ 85258 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NADEN, Mark 1091 W. Antelope Creek Way Oro Valley, Arizona 85737 / US | 02 /
KRISHNAN, Ramkumar 8165 E Clinton Street Scottsdale, Arizona 85260 / US | [2015/47] |
Former [2015/32] | 01 /
NADEN, Mark 1091 W. Antelope Creek Way Oro Valley, Arizona 85737 / US | ||
02 /
KRISHNAN, Ramkumar 10583 E. Tierra Buena Lane Scottsdale, Arizona 85255 / US | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 13842138.3 | 27.09.2013 | WO2013US62208 | Priority number, date | US201261707478P | 28.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261707478 P | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014052773 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2901544 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/158, H02J1/10 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
H02J1/102 (EP,CN,US);
H02M3/1584 (EP,CN,US);
H02M1/0025 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/32] | H02M3/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Title | German: | DURCHHANGKORREKTUR MIT STROMRÜCKKOPPLUNG | [2015/32] | English: | DROOP COMPENSATION USING CURRENT FEEDBACK | [2015/32] | French: | COMPENSATION DE LA DIMINUTION EN UTILISANT UN RETOUR D'INFORMATION DE COURANT | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 05.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 31.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2020 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006226822 (XU MING [US], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0030] - [0032]; figure 7 * | [IY] - CAPONIO F ET AL, "Modular and bi-directional energy storage system compliant with accumulators of different chemistry", ELECTRICAL POWER QUALITY AND UTILISATION (EPQU), 2011 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20111017), doi:10.1109/EPQU.2011.6128796, ISBN 978-1-4673-0379-8, pages 1 - 6, XP032092188 [I] 1-10,12-23 * II.A Parallelization (page 2); II:B Load sharing (page 2); III.A Topology without master controller (page 3);; figures 1-4 * [Y] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EPQU.2011.6128796 | International search | [X]US2006077604 (JANSEN ARIAN [US]); | [Y]US6969976 (BROACH MICHAEL EUGENE [US], et al); | [Y]US2011198998 (KASABA YUSUKE [JP], et al); | [Y]US2011199062 (SINGNURKAR PRAMOD [AT]); | [Y]US2010066169 (APFEL RUSSELL J [US]); | [A]US7180274 (CHEN TIEN-TZU [TW], et al); | [A]US8085005 (DEARN DAVID [GB]) | [Y] - LEE ET AL., "Metal-Air Batteries with High Energy Density: Li-Air versus Zn-Air.", ADVANCED ENERGY MATERIALS, vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1002/AENM.201000010, (2011), pages 34 - 50, URL: http://www.researchgate.net/publication/227985366_MetalAir Batteries_with_High_Energy-Density-LiAir_versus_ZnAir/file/79e4150bc00683d6b1.pdf, (20140214), XP055258257 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/aenm.201000010 |