EP2900059 - BOOT FOR HOOVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shings AB Sjötullsgatan 64 826 50 Söderhamn / SE | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYLUND, Marina Belse 3572 S-823 91 Kilafors / SE | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13842580.6 | 27.05.2013 | WO2013SE50602 | Priority number, date | SE20120051086 | 25.09.2012 Original published format: SE 1251086 | [2015/32] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014051489 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2900059 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01L3/00, A01K13/00 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
A01L3/00 (EP,SE,US);
A01K13/007 (EP,US);
A01L5/00 (SE);
A61D9/00 (US);
A61F5/0111 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0197 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/32] | A01L3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Title | German: | STIEFEL FÜR HUFE | [2015/32] | English: | BOOT FOR HOOVES | [2015/32] | French: | BOTTE POUR SABOTS | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 11.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]WO2004064668 (DODD ROGER [GB], et al) [YD] 1,3,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,5,8-19; | [Y]US2008264005 (FORD GARRETT N [US]) [Y] 1,3,6,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] , [0043] , [0056] , [0057] *; | [A]US992278 (SNELL GEORGE D [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US275872 (S. TAYLOR); | [A]US992278 (SNELL GEORGE D [US]); | [A]WO2004064668 (DODD ROGER [GB], et al); | [A]US289177 (J. THOMAS & J. BETZER); | [A]US1089235 (LEVEY JOSEPH K [US]); | [A]US1144344 (BISCHOFF KARL [US]); | [A]WO0064248 (WOOD GARY ADRIAN [NZ]); | [A]US1174848 (GEAR JESSE JOHN [US]); | [A]AU2010100541 (MARKOU ROBERT, et al); | [A]US2011000173 (LANDER KIRT [US]) |