EP2903506 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING PATIENT CARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spacelabs Healthcare LLC 35301 SE Center St Snoqualmie, WA 98065 / US | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Tim 20103 178th Ave. NE Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | 02 /
JENSEN, Patrick, Scott 22263 NE 7th St. Sammamish, WA 98074 / US | 03 /
OWEN, James, M. 13112 184th Ave. NE Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
GILMAN, Jeffrey, Jay 20339 NE 34th Ct. Sammamish, WA 98074 / US | 05 /
HAYS, Roy 3504 E. Spruce St. Seattle, WA 98122 / US | 06 /
DUNDON, James 11928 SE 210th Pl. Kent, WA 98031 / US | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13843278.6 | 02.10.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013US63087 | Priority number, date | US201261709883P | 04.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261709883 P | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014055660 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903506 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, A61B5/00 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/33] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON PATIENTENPFLEGE | [2015/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING PATIENT CARE | [2015/33] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE DE SOINS DE PATIENT | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 30.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/43] | 17.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010056877 (FEIN GENE [US], et al) [A] 1-8,10-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0045] *; | [YA]WO2010126797 (ONEMEDNET CORP [US], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0021] * [A] 1-8,10-15; | [IY]US2012041783 (MCKEE JOHN HENRY [US], et al) [I] 1-8,10-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0074] * * figure 12 * [Y] 9; | [Y] - Anonymous, "Routing table", Wikipedia, (20121003), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Routing_table&oldid=515747820, (20161121), XP055321398 [Y] 9 * the whole document * | [Y] - Anonymous, "Metrics (networking)", Wikipedia, (20120718), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Metrics_(networking)&oldid=502970743, (20161122), XP055321558 [Y] 9 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2008249376 (ZALESKI JOHN R [US]); | [Y]US2009099480 (SALGO PETER [US], et al); | [Y]US2010056875 (SCHOENBERG IDO [US], et al); | [Y]US2012209984 (GONZALEZ-BANOS HECTOR H [US], et al); | [Y]US2012232398 (ROHAM MASOUD [US], et al) |