EP2903858 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR STARTING AN ELECTRICALLY CONTROLLED ENGINE OF A TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo King LLC 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | [2023/18] |
Former [2015/33] | For all designated states Thermo King Corporation 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLALEYE, Omosola, Waidi 9831 Evergreen Ave. N. Brooklyn Park, MN 55443 / US | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Rowlands, Stuart Michael RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13843502.9 | 01.10.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013US62884 | Priority number, date | US201261708362P | 01.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261708362 P | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014055530 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903858 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/20, B60H1/32, F25B49/00, B60H1/00, // F02N11/08 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
B60P3/20 (EP,US);
B60H1/00428 (EP,US);
B60H1/32 (US);
B60H1/3232 (EP,US);
F02N11/08 (EP,US);
F02N11/087 (US);
F02N2011/0874 (US);
F02N2200/063 (EP,US);
F02N2250/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/33] | B60P3/20, B60H1/32, F25B49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM STARTEN EINES ELEKTRISCH GESTEUERTEN MOTORS EINER TRANSPORTKÜHLANLAGE | [2015/33] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR STARTING AN ELECTRICALLY CONTROLLED ENGINE OF A TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION SYSTEM | [2015/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE DÉMARRAGE D'UN MOTEUR À COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉFRIGÉRATION DE TRANSPORT | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 18.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5140826 (HANSON JAY L [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2000213850 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0007] - [0008]; figure 5 *; | [Y]US6176212 (VILOU GERARD [FR]) [Y] 1-14 * figure n *; | [I]US2004262995 (HAWKINS JEFFERY SCOTT [US]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0043]; figures 4B, 4C *; | [Y]US2012017618 (PRICE DANIEL L [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * figures 1-2 *; | [I]WO2012087626 (THERMO KING CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * figure 4 * | International search | [A]EP1790921 (CUMMINS GENERATOR TECHNOLOGIES [GB]); | [A]US2010000241 (KITANO SHIGEICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2012017618 (PRICE DANIEL L [US], et al); | [A]WO2012045056 (ARNOLD BRIAN R); | [X]US2012159971 (FINK ULRICH [US], et al) | by applicant | US6176212 | US2004262995 | WO2012087626 |