EP2903507 - ELECTROMECHANICAL MEASUREMENT OF STAPEDIUS MUSCLE/TENDON ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MED-EL Elektromedizinische Geraete GmbH Fuerstenweg 77 Innsbruck 6020 / AT | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESSLER, Roland Tiergartenstr. 61 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | 02 /
DHANASINGH, Anandhan Perthalergasse 1C 25 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | 03 /
DEL CARMEN FUENTES, Maria Mariahilfpark 2 Top 715 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | 04 /
PAU, Hans Wilhelm Stephanstraße 4 18055 Rostock / DE | 05 /
OVARI, Attila Paulstr. 2 18055 Rostock / DE | 06 /
BEHREND, Detlef Mühlenstraße 44 b 18119 Rostock-Warnemünde / DE | 07 /
WARKENTIN, Mareike Parkstraße 26 18059 Rostock / DE | 08 /
SPECHT, Olaf Massmannstraße 92 18057 Rostock / DE | 09 /
SCHMIDT, Wolfram Warener Straße 64 18109 Rostock / DE | [2015/48] |
Former [2015/33] | 01 /
HESSLER, Roland Tiergartenstr. 61 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | ||
02 /
DHANASINGH, Anandhan Perthalergasse 1C 25 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | |||
03 /
DEL CARMEN FUENTES, Maria Franz-Fischer-Straße 44 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | |||
04 /
PAU, Hans Wilhelm Stephanstraße 4 18055 Rostock / DE | |||
05 /
OVARI, Attila Ludwigstraße 8 18055 Rostock / DE | |||
06 /
BEHREND, Detlef Mühlenstraße 44 b 18119 Rostock-Warnemünde / DE | |||
07 /
WARKENTIN, Mareike Parkstraße 26 18059 Rostock / DE | |||
08 /
SPECHT, Olaf Massmannstraße 92 18057 Rostock / DE | |||
09 /
SCHMIDT, Wolfram Warener Straße 64 18109 Rostock / DE | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13843508.6 | 04.10.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013US63383 | Priority number, date | DE201210218153 | 04.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012218153 | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014055823 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903507 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2903507 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/04, A61B5/12, A61B5/0492, H04R25/00, A61N1/36 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
A61B5/125 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/296 (EP,CN,US);
A61N1/36036 (CN);
A61N1/36039 (EP,US);
H04R25/606 (EP,US);
A61N1/0541 (EP);
H04R2225/67 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/30] | A61B5/04, A61B5/0492, H04R25/00, A61N1/36 | ||
Former IPC [2015/33] | A61B5/04, A61B5/0492 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHE MESSUNG DER AKTIVITÄT VON STAPEDIUSMUSKELN/-SEHNEN | [2015/33] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICAL MEASUREMENT OF STAPEDIUS MUSCLE/TENDON ACTIVITY | [2015/33] | French: | MESURE ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE DE L'ACTIVITÉ DES MUSCLES/TENDONS STAPÉDIENS | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 16.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2013 | AL | 11.01.2017 | AT | 11.01.2017 | CY | 11.01.2017 | CZ | 11.01.2017 | DK | 11.01.2017 | EE | 11.01.2017 | ES | 11.01.2017 | FI | 11.01.2017 | HR | 11.01.2017 | IT | 11.01.2017 | LT | 11.01.2017 | LV | 11.01.2017 | MC | 11.01.2017 | MK | 11.01.2017 | NL | 11.01.2017 | PL | 11.01.2017 | RO | 11.01.2017 | RS | 11.01.2017 | SE | 11.01.2017 | SI | 11.01.2017 | SK | 11.01.2017 | SM | 11.01.2017 | TR | 11.01.2017 | BG | 11.04.2017 | NO | 11.04.2017 | GR | 12.04.2017 | IS | 11.05.2017 | PT | 11.05.2017 | IE | 04.10.2017 | LU | 04.10.2017 | MT | 04.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
TR | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US6208882 (LENARZ THOMAS H R [DE], et al); | [Y]US7792587 (SCHMIDT MARCUS [AT], et al); | [Y]US2011137180 (JOHNSON WILLIAM L [US], et al); | [Y]US8126572 (JOLLY CLAUDE [AT], et al); | [Y]US6157861 (FALTYS MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [Y]US8121687 (JENSEN MARC [US], et al); | [Y]US2011307042 (DECARMINE ANTHONY [US]); | [Y]US6485408 (ORTEN BIRGER [NO]) |