EP2904932 - CARTRIDGE-TYPE COSMETIC CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzuno Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 3-22 Shimoochiai 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-0033 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | For all designated states Suzuno Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 3-22 Shimoochiai 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-0033 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHBA, Atsushi c/o SUZUNO KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-22 Shimoochiai 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-0033 / JP | 02 /
MINAMINO, Tomoya c/o SUZUNO KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-22 Shimoochiai 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-0033 / JP | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2015/33] | Application number, filing date | 13844434.4 | 20.09.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013JP75426 | Priority number, date | JP20120221153 | 03.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012221153 | JP20130106319 | 20.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013106319 | [2015/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014054433 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2904932 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/04, A45D40/00 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
A45D40/00 (EP,CN,US);
A45D40/04 (EP,CN,US);
A45D40/16 (EP,CN,US);
A45D2040/0056 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETIKBEHÄLTER MIT EINER PATRONE | [2015/33] | English: | CARTRIDGE-TYPE COSMETIC CONTAINER | [2015/33] | French: | RÉCIPIENT COSMÉTIQUE DE TYPE CARTOUCHE | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2015 | Translation filed | 09.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 29.07.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09149813 (SUZUNO KASEI CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH08207U (SUZUNO KASEI CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2000300335 (L'OREAL) | by applicant | JPH0349611B |