EP2906428 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SUBSTRATE HAVING AN IMAGE ON AT LEAST ONE SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Intellectual Gorilla GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 42 6160 Entlebuch / CH | [2017/01] |
Former [2015/34] | For all designated states INTELLECTUAL GORILLA B.V. Strawinskylaan 1749 WTC Toren D, 12e Amsterdam 1077 / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANIELS, Evan, R. 11420 Chaucer Drive Frisco, TX 75035 / US | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/34] | Application number, filing date | 13845068.9 | 11.10.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013US64435 | Priority number, date | US201261713240P | 12.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261713240 P | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014059210 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2906428 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26, B41M7/00, B44C5/04 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
B44F9/02 (EP,US);
B41M5/0011 (EP,US);
B41M5/0047 (EP,US);
B41M5/007 (EP,US);
B41M7/0045 (EP,US);
B41M7/0054 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/34] | B41M5/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SUBSTRATS MIT EINEM BILD AUF MINDESTENS EINER OBERFLÄCHE | [2015/34] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SUBSTRATE HAVING AN IMAGE ON AT LEAST ONE SURFACE | [2015/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN SUBSTRAT COMPORTANT UNE IMAGE SUR AU MOINS UNE SURFACE | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 28.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2314462 (SCANNERY HOLZTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 9 * paragraphs [0015] , [0024] , [0030] - [0035]; claims 1-4,6,8-10 * [Y] 1-8,10-15; | [Y]US2012164402 (MURAKAMI HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0064] , [0078] *; | [A]US2005227006 (SEGALL RONALD H [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003015124 (KLUS DONALD F [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2004115350 (BOLTON JAMES A [US], et al); | [Y]US6964722 (TAYLOR DENE H [US], et al); | [Y]JP2008036549 (HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES LTD); | [A]JP2008179072 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]US2009181181 (HAUER PETER [AT], et al) |