EP2906614 - ENHANCED WATER AND TRANSFER RESISTANT FILM FORMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alzo International, Inc. 650 Jernee Mill Road Sayreville, NJ 08872 / US | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATEU, Juan R. 5668 Berkshire Valley Rd. Oak Ridge, NJ 07438 / US | 02 /
ZOFCHAK, Albert A. 4 Oakwood Court Holmdel, NJ 07333 / US | 03 /
MOSQUERA, Michael R. 439 Penn Ave North Forked River, NJ 08731 / US | 04 /
BATKO, Michael R. 5 Glynn Ct. Parlin, NJ 08859 / US | 05 /
AWAD, Nagi 322 Freemans Lane Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | 06 /
BICHO, Brianna 82 Racetrack Road East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Dall'Olio, Christian, et al INVENTION S.r.l. Via delle Armi, 1 40137 Bologna / IT | [2015/34] | Application number, filing date | 13845456.6 | 08.10.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013US63845 | Priority number, date | US201261713102P | 12.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261713102 P | US201361788603P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361788603 P | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014058856 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2906614 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/03, C08L101/00, C08L83/00, C08J5/18, A61Q1/04, A61K8/81, A61Q1/06, A61Q1/10, A61Q19/00, A61K8/87, A61K8/891, A61K8/898, C08J3/18, C08L75/08, C08L83/04 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C08L83/06 (US);
A61K8/8117 (EP,US);
A61K8/8188 (EP,US);
A61K8/87 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61K8/898 (EP,US);
A61Q1/04 (EP,US);
A61Q1/06 (EP,US);
A61Q1/10 (EP,US);
C08J3/18 (US);
C08L75/08 (US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
A61K2800/10 (EP,US);
C08J2375/08 (EP,US);
C08J2383/06 (EP,US);
C08J2475/08 (EP,US);
C08J2483/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L71/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/34] | C08J3/03, C08L101/00, C08L83/00, C08J5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | 06.05.2015 | ME | 06.05.2015 | Title | German: | BILDUNG EINES FILMS MIT ERHÖHTER WASSER- UND ABRIEBBESTÄNDIGKEIT | [2015/34] | English: | ENHANCED WATER AND TRANSFER RESISTANT FILM FORMING | [2015/34] | French: | FORMATION PERFECTIONNÉE DE FILM ÉTANCHE ET RÉSISTANT AU TRANSFERT | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 11.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 06.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010123865 (CARSON PRODUCT DEV INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11-13 * example 10 *; | [A]WO2012135281 (ALZO INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16* example -; claim - * | International search | [A]US6936686 (AWAD NAGI M [US]); | [A]US2006051309 (PATZER MAIKE [DE], et al); | [X]US2009232752 (CARSON JOHN C [US], et al); | [A]US2010196292 (CARSON JOHN C [US], et al); | [Y]US2010322877 (ZOFCHAK ALBERT A [US], et al) |