EP2906536 - AN IMPROVED PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF PERINDOPRIL INTERMEDIATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piramal Enterprises Limited Piramal Tower Ganpatrao Kadam Marg Lower Parel Mumbai 400 013 / IN | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGH, Ganesh 1 Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway Goregaon East Mumbai 400063 / IN | 02 /
JAGTAP, Ashutosh 1 Nirlon Complex Off Western Express Highway Goregaon East Mumbai 400063 / IN | 03 /
ROY, Mita 28B Kalpataru Habitat SS Rao Road Mumbai 400012 / IN | 04 /
HARIHARAN, Sivaramakrishnan A 701, Brentwood House of Hiranandani 5/63, Rajiv Gandhi Salai (OMR) Egattur Chennai 603103 / IN | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Richards, Michèle E. Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [2018/11] |
Former [2015/34] | Richards, Michèle E. Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13845500.1 | 04.10.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013IB59112 | Priority number, date | IN2012MUM2961 | 10.10.2012 Original published format: IN 2961MU2012 | [2017/16] |
Former [2015/34] | INMM29612012 | 10.10.2012 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014057404 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2906536 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2906536 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 17.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/42, C07K5/08 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
C07D209/42 (EP,US);
C07K5/06026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/34] | C07D209/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PERINDOPRIL-ZWISCHENPRODUKTS | [2015/34] | English: | AN IMPROVED PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF PERINDOPRIL INTERMEDIATE | [2015/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ AMÉLIORÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN INTERMÉDIAIRE DE PÉRINDOPRIL | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 25.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2017 | Observations by third parties | 30.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2017 | Observations by third parties | 21.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.2018
19.12.2018
ADMISSIBLE Aarti Industries Ltd. 71, Udyog Kshetra Link Road Mulund Goregaon Link Road Mulund (W) 400 080 Mumbai / IN Opponent's representative Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2019/04] | 04.01.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.05.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.05.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/43] | 05.06.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2013 | AL | 14.03.2018 | AT | 14.03.2018 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | IT | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MK | 14.03.2018 | NL | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | RS | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | SM | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | IE | 04.10.2018 | LU | 04.10.2018 | MT | 04.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | GB | 04.10.2019 | ES | 05.10.2019 | SE | 05.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | FR | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | DE | 01.05.2020 | [2022/34] |
Former [2020/48] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
MT | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
GB | 04.10.2019 | ||
SE | 05.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
MT | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 05.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
MT | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
MT | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
MT | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
MT | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
MT | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2006178422 (KUMAR ASHOK [US], et al); | [A]WO2008114270 (AARTI HEALTHCARE LTD [IN], et al); | [A]EP1679072 (IPCA LAB LTD [IN]); | [A]WO2006131828 (AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD [IN], et al) | other | US2006178422 | EP1679072 | WO2012063252 | - "Open Part Customer (In CTD format) - Perindopril tert-Butylamine (Front page, table of contents and sections 3.2.S.2.2.1 - 3.2.S.2.2.3)", Brochure Aarti Industries, (20100600), pages 2PP, 1, 1 - 7, XP055339764 | - Aarti Healthcare API Division of Aarti Industries Ltd., "Products", INTERNET ARCHIVE SERVICE WAYBACK MACHINE, (20120418), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120418091047/http://www.aartihealthcare.com:80/Products.html, XP055396984 | - European Directorate for the Quality of Medicines & HealthCare, "Guidance for electronic and paper submissionsfor Certificates of Suitability (CEP) applications", Certification of suitability to Monographs of the European Pharmacopoeia PA/PH/CEP (09) 108, 2R, pages 1 - 20, XP055396975 | Opposition | US2006178422 | EP1679072 | WO2012063252 | - Anonymous, "Open part Customer. PERINDOPRIL tert-BUTYLAMINEPh. Eur", Brochure AARTI INDUSTRIES, (20100623), XP055339764 | - anonymous, "Guideline on Active Substance Master File Procedure. Final", EMEA EMEA/CVMP/134/02 Rev.3, (20130531), pages 1 - 22, URL: https://www.ema.europa.eu/documents/scientific-guideline/guideline-active-substance-master-file-procedure-revision-3_en.pdf, XP055538629 | - "Products", AARTI HEALTHCARE API DIVISION OF AARTI INDUSTRIES LTD, (20120418), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.aartihealthcare.com:80/Products.html, XP055396984 | - European Directorate For The Quality Of Medicines & Healthcare, "Guidance for electronic and paper submissions for Certificates of Suitability (CEP) applications", Certification of suitability to Monographs of the European Pharmacopoeia PA/PH/CEP (09) 108, 2R, (20130600), pages 1 - 20, URL: https://www.edqm.eu/medias/fichiers/cep_guidance_for_electronic_applications_paphcep_0.pdf, XP055396975 | - So-Yeop Han et al, "Recent development of peptide coupling reagentsin organic synthesis", Tetrahedron, vol. 60, no. 11, (20040300), pages 2447 - 2467, XP055538655 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2004.01.020 |