Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2904506 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380052477 CN201810030059 CN201810030244 CN201810030573 EP13845602 EP17157955 EP18159529 EP19161969 JP2015535887 JP2017080174

More

JP2018205044 KR20157011958 KR20187017749 US2013063820W US201314048394 US201615295959 US201715425933 US201816174003 US202016941466 US202318142925 US202418436591



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024187481Global Dossier 06.06.2024A1
Priority number Date
US201816174003 29.10.2018
US201314048394 08.10.2013
US202016941466 28.07.2020
US201261710998 08.10.2012
US201715425933 06.02.2017
US202318142925 03.05.2023
US201615295959 17.10.2016
US202418436591 08.02.2024
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9509803Global Dossier 29.11.2016B2
US2014101238 10.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314048394 08.10.2013
US201261710998 08.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11930077Global Dossier 12.03.2024B2
US2023283665 07.09.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201816174003 29.10.2018
US201314048394 08.10.2013
US202016941466 28.07.2020
US201261710998 08.10.2012
US201715425933 06.02.2017
US202318142925 03.05.2023
US201615295959 17.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11677823Global Dossier 13.06.2023B2
US2020358851 12.11.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201816174003 29.10.2018
US201314048394 08.10.2013
US202016941466 28.07.2020
US201261710998 08.10.2012
US201715425933 06.02.2017
US201615295959 17.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10819790Global Dossier 27.10.2020B2
US2019068710 28.02.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201816174003 29.10.2018
US201314048394 08.10.2013
US201261710998 08.10.2012
US201715425933 06.02.2017
US201615295959 17.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10778766Global Dossier 15.09.2020B2
US2017149898 25.05.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201314048394 08.10.2013
US201261710998 08.10.2012
US201715425933 06.02.2017
US201615295959 17.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10158713Global Dossier 18.12.2018B2
US2017034276 02.02.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201314048394 08.10.2013
US201261710998 08.10.2012
US201615295959 17.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102081012BGlobal Dossier 24.02.2020B1
KR20180072877 29.06.2018A
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
WO2013US63820 08.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101872570BGlobal Dossier 28.06.2018B1
KR20150067325 17.06.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
WO2013US63820 08.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6130919BGlobal Dossier 17.05.2017B2
JP2016502695 28.01.2016A
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
WO2013US63820 08.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3518115Global Dossier 02.12.2020B1
EP3518115 31.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP17157955 08.10.2013
US201261710998 08.10.2012
EP13845602 08.10.2013
WO2013US63820 08.10.2013
EP18159529 08.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3349121Global Dossier 24.04.2019B1
EP3349121 18.07.2018A1
Priority number Date
EP17157955 08.10.2013
US201261710998 08.10.2012
EP13845602 08.10.2013
WO2013US63820 08.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3190526Global Dossier 02.05.2018B1
EP3190526 12.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP13845602 08.10.2013
US201261710998 08.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108306947BGlobal Dossier 26.02.2021B
CN108306947 20.07.2018A
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
CN201380052477 08.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108306946BGlobal Dossier 16.03.2021B
CN108306946 20.07.2018A
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
CN201380052477 08.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108306945BGlobal Dossier 22.01.2021B
CN108306945 20.07.2018A
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
CN201380052477 08.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104769571BGlobal Dossier 13.02.2018B
CN104769571 08.07.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
WO2013US63820 08.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2904506Global Dossier 12.04.2017B1
EP2904506 20.07.2016A4
EP2904506 12.08.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
WO2013US63820 08.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2625828T 20.07.2017T3
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
WO2013US63820 08.10.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014058842Global Dossier 17.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6717914BGlobal Dossier 08.07.2020B2
JP2019071063 09.05.2019A
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6430575BGlobal Dossier 28.11.2018B2
JP2017152023 31.08.2017A
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2679799T 31.08.2018T3
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2728762T 28.10.2019T3
Priority number Date
US201261710998 08.10.2012
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3190526
 EP3349121
 EP3518115