Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2907022 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380059679 CN202010705625 EP13845803 EP19212340 EP22214771 JP2015536962 JP2018084095 JP2020021304 US2013064644W US201313801958

More

US201816015492 US202117172970 US202218074138 US202318225033



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023359656Global Dossier 09.11.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201816015492 22.06.2018
US202117172970 10.02.2021
US202218074138 02.12.2022
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
US202318225033 21.07.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023161799Global Dossier 25.05.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201816015492 22.06.2018
US202117172970 10.02.2021
US202218074138 02.12.2022
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11544310Global Dossier 03.01.2023B2
US2021200798 01.07.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201816015492 22.06.2018
US202117172970 10.02.2021
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10949453Global Dossier 16.03.2021B2
US2018365320 20.12.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201816015492 22.06.2018
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6333831BGlobal Dossier 30.05.2018B2
JP2016502696 28.01.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2013US64644 11.10.2013
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4220432Global Dossier 02.08.2023A1
Priority number Date
EP13845803 11.10.2013
EP19212340 11.10.2013
WO2013US64644 11.10.2013
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3657317Global Dossier 27.05.2020A1
Priority number Date
EP13845803 11.10.2013
WO2013US64644 11.10.2013
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN111858889Global Dossier 30.10.2020A
Priority number Date
CN201380059679 11.10.2013
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104969173BGlobal Dossier 18.08.2020B
CN104969173 07.10.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013US64644 11.10.2013
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2907022Global Dossier 06.07.2016A4
EP2907022 19.08.2015A2
Priority number Date
WO2013US64644 11.10.2013
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014059342Global Dossier 19.06.2014A3
WO2014059342 17.04.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10031968Global Dossier 24.07.2018B2
US2014108453 17.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP7095000BGlobal Dossier 04.07.2022B2
JP2020102234 02.07.2020A
Priority number Date
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6722225BGlobal Dossier 15.07.2020B2
JP2018147506 20.09.2018A
Priority number Date
US201261712720 11.10.2012
US201313801958 13.03.2013
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3657317