EP2908400 - ELECTRICAL POWER INTERCHANGE SYSTEM, ELECTRICITY-TRANSMITTING/-RECEIVING DEVICE, ELECTRICAL POWER INTERCHANGE METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Noriaki c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/34] | Application number, filing date | 13846214.8 | 23.08.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013JP04979 | Priority number, date | JP20120224126 | 09.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012224126 | [2015/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014057601 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2908400 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/46, H02J13/00 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
H02J3/46 (EP,US);
H02J13/00 (US);
H02J13/00017 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y04S10/12 (US);
Y04S40/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Title | German: | STROMAUSTAUSCHSYSTEM, ELEKTRIZITÄTSÜBERTRAGUNGS-/-EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG, STROMAUSTAUSCHVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2015/34] | English: | ELECTRICAL POWER INTERCHANGE SYSTEM, ELECTRICITY-TRANSMITTING/-RECEIVING DEVICE, ELECTRICAL POWER INTERCHANGE METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2015/34] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCHANGE D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE, DISPOSITIF D'ÉMISSION/RÉCEPTION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCHANGE D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE, ET PROGRAMME | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2015 | Translation filed | 09.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 21.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009076661 (PEARSON KEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0018] ** paragraph [0105] *; | [Y]US2011106321 (CHERIAN SUNIL [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0080] * | International search | [Y]JP2002281666 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [A]JP2004015882 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]WO2012124368 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2003032887 |