EP2909267 - IMPACT RESISTANT TRANSPARENT THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trinseo Europe GmbH Zugerstrasse 231 8810 Horgen / CH | [2021/40] |
Former [2015/35] | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARSOTTI, Robert J. 636 Shadeland Ave. Drexel Hill, Pennsylvania 19026 / US | 02 /
MACY, Noah E. 108 Abbey Drive Royersford, Pennsylvania 19468 / US | 03 /
AUBART, Mark A. 1664 Bow Tree Drive West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US | 04 /
WANAT, Robert A. 20 Wynchwood Lane Langhorne, Pennsylvania 19047 / US | 05 /
FELLENGER, Paul D. 535 Blue Lake Road Denver, Pennsylvania 17517 / US | 06 /
MEHLMANN, Florence 439 Jean Drive King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 07 /
ROLAND, Thomas F. 6981 Corning Road Zionsville, Pennsylvania 18092 / US | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 13846352.6 | 15.10.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013US64914 | Priority number, date | US201261714409P | 16.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261714409 P | [2015/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014062601 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2909267 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2909267 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08L55/00, C07F7/18, C08L9/00, C08L51/06, C08L67/04, C08F265/06 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
C08F265/06 (EP,US);
C08L51/003 (US);
C08J3/005 (US);
C08L33/12 (US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (US);
C08J2333/12 (EP,US);
C08J2351/00 (EP,US);
C08J2367/04 (EP,US);
C08L2201/10 (US);
C08L2205/03 (US);
C08L2205/06 (US);
C08L2207/53 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F265/06, C08F2/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/35] | C08L55/00, C07F7/18, C08L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAGZÄHE TRANSPARENTE THERMOPLASTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2015/35] | English: | IMPACT RESISTANT TRANSPARENT THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITIONS | [2015/35] | French: | COMPOSITIONS THERMOPLASTIQUES TRANSPARENTES RÉSISTANTES AU CHOC | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 14.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2023 | CZ | 19.07.2023 | DK | 19.07.2023 | EE | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | FI | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | LT | 19.07.2023 | LV | 19.07.2023 | MC | 19.07.2023 | NL | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SE | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | LU | 15.10.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | PT | 20.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/30] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
LU | 15.10.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 19.07.2023 | |
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 19.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001031852 (KURARAY CO) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,13 * examples 1,3 * * tables 1-3 * * paragraph [0085] *; | [X]EP1721936 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-10,13,14* examples 9,15; table 1 *; | [X]EP1785453 (UNITIKA LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,8-10,13 * Comparative example 3;; examples 3,11,13; table 2 *; | [XI]WO2008051443 (NATUREWORKS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11,13,14 * page 10, line 9 - line 25 * * page 13, line 19 - line 24 * * examples 2-4 * * table 1 * [I] 12; | [X]WO2008056849 (CHEIL IND INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,7,8,13 * example 3 * * paragraph [0106] * | International search | [Y]US5096995 (FUKUMOTO TADAO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2009018237 (FUJII SHIGETA [JP], et al); | [X]US7589151 (AOKI HIDEO [JP], et al) | by applicant | US3661994 | US4521568 | US2003216510 | EP1721936 | US2009018237 | US7580151 |