EP2937002 - CIGARETTE DISPENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIT S.A. Mas Mia s/nº Dosrius 08319 Barcelona / ES | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FABREGAS PEDRELL, Jose Maria Mas Mia s/nº Dosrius 08319 Barcelona / ES | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Diaz Nunez, Joaquin J.D. Núñez Patentes y Marcas, S.L. Rambla Catalunya 120 08008 Barcelona / ES | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 13846481.3 | 28.11.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013ES00265 | Priority number, date | ES20120031974 | 20.12.2012 Original published format: ES 201231974 | [2015/44] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014060616 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | ES | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937002 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2937002 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 24.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A24F15/18, A24F15/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
A24F15/005 (EP,US);
A24F15/14 (ES);
A24F15/18 (ES)
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | A24F15/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZIGARETTENAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2015/44] | English: | CIGARETTE DISPENSING DEVICE | [2015/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DISTRIBUTEUR DE CIGARETTES | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2015 | Translation filed | 28.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 12.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2019 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2013 | AL | 19.02.2020 | AT | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | CZ | 19.02.2020 | DK | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MK | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | NL | 19.02.2020 | PL | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | RS | 19.02.2020 | SE | 19.02.2020 | SI | 19.02.2020 | SK | 19.02.2020 | SM | 19.02.2020 | TR | 19.02.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | NO | 19.05.2020 | GR | 20.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | PT | 12.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 28.11.2013 | |
AL | 19.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.11.2013 | |
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
NO | 19.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6125082 (REID ADONIS M [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2002145002 (HUNG MEI-CHU [TW]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2004031498 (BRUE VESTA L [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] , [0016] , [0017] , [0039] - [0041]; figure - *; | [X]CN201518726U (ZHILIN YANG) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2012129705 (SNM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [I] 1-4 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 4 * * page 8, lines 1-8 * * page 9, lines 11-14 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 9 * * figure - * | International search | [A]ES1055235U (MARTOS REVUELTAS EUGENIO [ES]); | [A]US2004031498 (BRUE VESTA L [US]); | [A]ES2299320 (FAGOR S COOP [ES]); | [A]WO2012129705 (SNM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) | by applicant | US5203472 | US5566855 | JP2002051761 | ES2299320 |