EP2906682 - BACTERIAL LIVE VECTOR VACCINES EXPRESSING CHROMOSOMALLY-INTEGRATED FOREIGN ANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Maryland, Baltimore 620 West Lexington Street, 4th Floor Baltimore, MD 21201-1627 / US | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALEN, James E. 5807 Victor Drive Eldersburg, Maryland 21784-8439 / US | 02 /
WANG, Jin-Yuan 13105 Shinnecock Drive Silver Spring, Maryland 20904 / US | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Jones, Elizabeth Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13847433.3 | 14.10.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013US64872 | Priority number, date | US201261713806P | 15.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261713806 P | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014062580 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2906682 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, C12N15/74, A61K39/112 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
C12N15/74 (EP,US);
A61K39/0275 (US);
A61K39/0291 (EP,US);
A61K39/08 (EP,US);
A61K2039/522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/523 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Title | German: | CHROMOSOMAL INTEGRIERTE FREMDANTIGENE EXPRIMIERENDE BAKTERIELLE LEBENDVEKTORIMPFSTOFFE | [2015/34] | English: | BACTERIAL LIVE VECTOR VACCINES EXPRESSING CHROMOSOMALLY-INTEGRATED FOREIGN ANTIGENS | [2015/34] | French: | VACCINS À VECTEUR BACTÉRIEN VIVANT EXPRIMANT DES ANTIGÈNES ÉTRANGERS INTÉGRÉS DANS UN CHROMOSOME | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 23.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.04.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]WO0032047 (UNIV MARYLAND [US], et al); | [XY]WO2011060431 (UNIV MARYLAND [US], et al); | International search | [A]WO03097838 (COBRA THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al); | [A]US2008233094 (VINDURAMPULLE CHRISTOFER [AU], et al); | [A]US2010112674 (GALEN JAMES E [US], et al); | [X] - GALEN, JAMES E. ET AL., "A new generation of stable, nonantibiotic, low-copy-number plasmids improves immune responses to foreign antigens in Salmonella enterica serovar Typhi live vectors", INFECT. IMMUN., (20091102), vol. 78, no. 1, pages 337 - 347, XP055043275 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.00916-09 | [A] - GALEN, JAMES E. ET AL., "Mucosal immunization with attenuated Salmonella enterica serovar Typhi expressing protective antigen of anthrax toxin (PA83) primes monkeys for accelerated serum antibody responses to parenteral PA83 vaicine", J. INFECT. DIS., (20090201), vol. 199, no. 3, pages 326 - 335, XP055243109 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/596066 |