EP2910517 - WATER SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Cosmo Life 358-1 Bingo Kakogawa-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo 675-0032 / JP | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORITA Yoshinori 579-9 Nakatsu Kakogawa-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo 675-0068 / JP | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/35] | Application number, filing date | 13847793.0 | 20.08.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013JP72155 | Priority number, date | JP20120231521 | 19.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012231521 | [2015/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014061346 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2910517 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/07, B67D1/08, B67D3/00 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
B67D3/0009 (EP,US);
B67D1/0801 (US);
B67D1/0004 (EP,US);
B67D1/07 (EP,US);
B67D1/0895 (EP,US);
B67D1/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/35] | B67D1/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Title | German: | WASSERSERVIERER | [2015/35] | English: | WATER SERVER | [2015/35] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR D'EAU | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2015 | Translation filed | 19.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 02.09.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5833096 (OHU H B [KR]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 13-48; figures 1-4,10,11 *; | [A]EP2447208 (INBEV NV AB [BE]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0019] - [0021]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]US4765512 (BULL JR GLEN C [US]); | [A]JP2008056325 (HOKUEI KK); | [A]US2009120956 (DE LA FE DAHLIN CARLOS [SE]); | [A]JP2010235135 (DUSKIN CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2008273605 |