EP2862865 - NOVEL METALLOCENE COMPOUND, CATALYST COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME, AND OLEFINIC POLYMER PRODUCTION METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | For all designated states Federal State Budgetary Educational Institution of Higher Professional Education Lomonosov Moscow State University 1 Leninskye gory Moscow 119991 / RU | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Se-Young LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Min-Seok LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 03 /
NECHAEV, Mikhail 147 apt 15 Kolomenskaya Moscow 115142 / RU | 04 /
LEE, Ki-Soo LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Yong-Ho LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 06 /
CHO, Kyung-Jin LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 07 /
LEE, Sung-Min LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 08 /
BUSH, Alexandr 18 apt 11 Slavyanskaya str. Belgorod Belgorod region 308036 / RU | 09 /
LEE, Min-jong LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 10 /
KHOKHLOV, Alexey 6 apt. 64 a Vernadsky avenue Moscow 119454 / RU | 11 /
ASACHENKO, Andrey 42 apt. 14a Podol' skaya str. Podol'sk Moscow region 142134 / RU | 12 /
DZHEVAKOV, Pavel room 1005/B 33a Ostrovityanova str. Moscow 117279 / RU | 13 /
MOROZOV, Oleg 19 Litovsky boulevard Moscow 117593 / RU | 14 /
VALEEVA, Yulia 119 apt. 66 Stara-Zagora str. Samara 443081 / RU | 15 /
SMIRNOV, Alexander 24 Polyarnay str. Opaliha district Krasnogorsk Moscow region 143444 / RU | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/33] |
Former [2015/17] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13848006.6 | 23.09.2013 | [2018/33] | WO2013KR08490 | Priority number, date | RU20120144355 | 17.10.2012 Original published format: RU 2012144355 | KR20130069126 | 17.06.2013 Original published format: KR 20130069126 | [2015/17] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014061921 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2862865 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2862865 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/64, C07F17/00, B01J31/12, B01J31/22, C08F110/02, C08F210/16, C08F4/6592 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (US);
B01J31/12 (US);
B01J31/22 (US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
B01J2231/12 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/02, C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/04 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F2500/14, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/04 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | C07F17/00, C08F4/64, C08F10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE METALLOCENVERBINDUNG, KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT UND OLEFINPOLYMERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2015/17] | English: | NOVEL METALLOCENE COMPOUND, CATALYST COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME, AND OLEFINIC POLYMER PRODUCTION METHOD USING SAME | [2015/17] | French: | NOUVEAU COMPOSÉ DE MÉTALLOCÈNE, COMPOSITION DE CATALYSEUR LE COMPRENANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYMÈRE OLÉFINIQUE L'EMPLOYANT | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2015 | Translation filed | 15.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 21.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2013 | AL | 15.08.2018 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | PT | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | IE | 23.09.2018 | LU | 23.09.2018 | MT | 23.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 23.09.2013 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
MT | 23.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
MT | 23.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
MT | 23.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0798306 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * example - *; | [Y]US2004249096 (MCCULLOUGH LAUGHLIN GERARD [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-6* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5990254 (WELLER THOMAS [DE], et al); | [X]US7112638 (NIFANT EV ILYA E [RU], et al); | [X]KR20080065868 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [X]KR20110043464 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A] - RONALD L. HALTERMAN ET AL., "Synthesis and structure of ansa-metallocene complexes (MZrC12, TiCl2, YCI, and LuCl) containing the bis(2-methyl-4,5,6,7-tetrahydroinden-yl) dimethylsilane ligand", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 604, pages 12 - 19, XP004215344 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-328X(00)00177-7 | by applicant | US5064802 | EP1462464 | KR100820542B | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, page 10358 |