EP2925449 - HANDLING LIQUID SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gencell Biosystems Limited Ballycummin Avenue Raheen Business Park Raheen, Limerick / IE | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CURRAN, Kieran Lisnalty Ballyclough County Limeric / IE | 02 /
MCGUIRE, David 189 Shingan Milehouse Enniscorthy County Wexford / IE | 03 /
CHAWKE, Brian Milltown Askeaton County Limerick / IE | 04 /
FLEMING, Paul 32 Cois Ghrude Kilbane Castleroy County Limerick / IE | 05 /
BARRETT, Brian 5 Limetree Grove Dualla Road Cashel County Tipperary / IE | 06 /
SIRR, Noel Lisageeragh Ballymoe County Gatway / IE | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [2015/41] | Application number, filing date | 13848129.6 | 26.11.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013IB03145 | Priority number, date | US201261730336P | 27.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261730336 P | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014083435 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2925449 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01L7/00, B01L3/02, B01L3/00 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
B01L3/022 (EP,US);
B01L3/502 (US);
B01L3/50851 (EP,US);
B01L7/00 (US);
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6806 (US);
B01L2200/0605 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0673 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0684 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0829 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0838 (EP,US);
B01L2300/12 (US);
B01L2300/161 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1827 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1883 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Title | German: | HANDHABUNG FLÜSSIGER PROBEN | [2015/41] | English: | HANDLING LIQUID SAMPLES | [2015/41] | French: | MANIPULATION D'ÉCHANTILLONS DE LIQUIDE | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 30.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3783696 (COLEMAN C) [X] 1,2,4-7,10 * column 1, lines 50-65 * * column 2, lines 6-17, 54-61 * * column 3, lines 1-10, 20-23, 40-45, 55-59 * * column 4, line 33 - line 40 * * column 5, line 5 - line 8 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,8,9,11; | [A]US3952599 (AYRES WALDEMAR A) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5059398 (KENNEY JAMES W [US]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [Y]US2002009392 (WOLK JEFFREY A [US], et al) [Y] 3,8 * paragraphs [0007] , [ 0011] , [ 0013] , [0037] , [ 0046] , [ 0069] , [ 0070] , [ 0077] - [0086] *; | [A]DE10039195 (HIRSCHMANN LABORGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2009260458 (JOSEPH VICTOR [US], et al) [Y] 9,11 * paragraphs [0050] , [ 0051] , [ 0057] , [ 0092] , [ 0093] * * figure 5 * | Examination | US6423536 |