EP2911691 - METHODS OF TREATING NEUROENDOCRINE TUMORS USING WNT PATHWAY-BINDING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OncoMed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAGG, Robert, Joseph 2 Silvia Court Moraga, CA 94556 / US | 02 /
DUPONT, Jacob 1229 Cardigan Road Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | Sutcliffe, Nicholas Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 13848322.7 | 22.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013US66087 | Priority number, date | US201261717294P | 23.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261717294 P | US201361760529P | 04.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361760529 P | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014066328 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2911691 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2911691 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C12N15/11, A61P35/00, C07K16/28 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
C07K16/3053 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K38/177 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/705 (US);
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/36] | A61K39/395, C12N15/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEUROENDOKRINEN TUMOREN MIT WNT-PAD-BINDEMITTELN | [2015/36] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING NEUROENDOCRINE TUMORS USING WNT PATHWAY-BINDING AGENTS | [2015/36] | French: | MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS NEURO-ENDOCRINES À L'AIDE D'AGENTS LIANTS DE PARCOURS WNT | [2015/36] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 22.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2013 | AL | 10.10.2018 | AT | 10.10.2018 | CY | 10.10.2018 | CZ | 10.10.2018 | DK | 10.10.2018 | EE | 10.10.2018 | ES | 10.10.2018 | FI | 10.10.2018 | HR | 10.10.2018 | IT | 10.10.2018 | LT | 10.10.2018 | LV | 10.10.2018 | MC | 10.10.2018 | MK | 10.10.2018 | NL | 10.10.2018 | PL | 10.10.2018 | RO | 10.10.2018 | RS | 10.10.2018 | SE | 10.10.2018 | SI | 10.10.2018 | SK | 10.10.2018 | SM | 10.10.2018 | TR | 10.10.2018 | IE | 22.10.2018 | LU | 22.10.2018 | MT | 22.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | BG | 10.01.2019 | NO | 10.01.2019 | GR | 11.01.2019 | IS | 10.02.2019 | PT | 10.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
MT | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
MT | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 22.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 22.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 10.10.2018 | |
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 10.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008031009 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 99 - page 102 *; | [XI]WO2010037041 (ONCOMED PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,14,20 * paragraph [0374]; examples 12,13,15-18 * [I] 1-20; | [XI]US2011020368 (HYNES NANCY [CH]) [X] 1,2,6,14,20 * paragraphs [0014] , [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0137] * [I] 1-20; | [I]WO2012003189 (IRM LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0057] , [0083] - paragraph [0084] * * the whole document *; | [XI] - A. GURNEY ET AL, "Wnt pathway inhibition via the targeting of Frizzled receptors results in decreased growth and tumorigenicity of human tumors", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20120702), vol. 109, no. 29, doi:10.1073/pnas.1120068109, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11717 - 11722, XP055204893 [X] 1,2,6,7,14,20 * page 11719, column l, paragraph 1 - page 17120, column l, paragraph l * [I] 1-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1120068109 | [I] - N PODE-SHAKKED ET AL, "Resistance or sensitivity of Wilms' tumor to anti-FZD7 antibody highlights the Wnt pathway as a possible therapeutic target", ONCOGENE, (20110407), vol. 30, no. 14, doi:10.1038/onc.2010.549, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 1664 - 1680, XP055061288 [I] 1-20 * page 1665, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 2 * * page 1667, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2010.549 | International search | [X]US2011020368 (HYNES NANCY [CH]); | [X]WO2012003189 (IRM LLC [US], et al); | [Y]US2012027778 (GURNEY AUSTIN L [US]) | Examination | - A. GURNEY ET AL, "Supporting information: Wnt pathway inhibition via the targeting of Frizzled receptors results in decreased growth and tumorigenicity of human tumors", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20120702), vol. 109, no. 29, doi:10.1073/pnas.1120068109, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1 - 3, XP055342843 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1120068109 | by applicant | US3773919 | US4485045 | US4544545 | US4816567 | US5013556 | US5750373 | WO2008031009 | WO2010037041 | US2011020368 | WO2012003189 | - WU; NUSSE, J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 41762 - 9 | - MILLER et al., Oncogene, (19990000), vol. 18, pages 7860 - 72 | - JOHNSON et al., J. Bone Mineral Res., (20040000), vol. 19, page 1749 | - FUJIMORI et al., Cancer Res., (20010000), vol. 61, no. 18, pages 6656 - 9 | - SU et al., Ann. Surg. Oncol., (20060000), vol. 13, no. 12, pages 1604 - 9 | - GURNEY et al., PNAS, (20120000), vol. 109, no. 29, pages 11717 - 11722 | - PODE-SHAKKED et al., Oncogene, (20110000), vol. 30, pages 1664 - 1680 | - MCCAFFERTY et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - CLACKSON et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - COLE et al., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, Alan R. Liss, (19850000), page 77 | - BOEMER et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, no. 1, pages 86 - 95 | - VAUGHAN et al., Nat. Biotech., (19960000), vol. 14, pages 309 - 314 | - SHEETS et al., Proc. Nat'l. Acad. Sci., (19980000), vol. 95, pages 6157 - 6162 | - HOOGENBOOM; WINTER, J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 227, page 381 | - MARKS et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, page 581 | - EPSTEIN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19850000), vol. 82, page 3688 | - HWANG et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, page 4030 |