EP2913871 - NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY, NEGATIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY, AND LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 9-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOUZU, Masayuki c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 3-1 Ayukawa-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316-0036 / JP | 02 /
TSUCHIYA, Hideyuki c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 3-1 Ayukawa-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316-0036 / JP | 03 /
OHZEKI, Katsutomo c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 1 Mito Tako-machi Katori-gun Chiba 289-2247 / JP | 04 /
OOSAKI, Yoshie c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 1 Mito Tako-machi Katori-gun Chiba 289-2247 / JP | 05 /
NISHIDA, Tatsuya c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 3-1 Ayukawa-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316-0036 / JP | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 13848864.8 | 25.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013JP79036 | Priority number, date | JP20120237256 | 26.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012237256 | [2015/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014065417 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2913871 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2913871 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/485, H01M4/62, // H01M4/02, H01M4/587, H01M10/0525 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
H01M4/366 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/364 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/131 (US);
H01M4/133 (US);
H01M4/134 (KR);
H01M4/386 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/48 (CN,KR);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,US);
H01M2004/027 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/36] | H01M4/48, H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/587 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEGATIVELEKTRODENMATERIAL FÜR EINE LITHIUM-IONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, NEGATIVELEKTRODE FÜR EINE LITHIUM-IONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND LITHIUM-IONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2015/36] | English: | NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY, NEGATIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY, AND LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY | [2015/36] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION, ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2015 | Translation filed | 07.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 01.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2013 | AL | 13.06.2018 | AT | 13.06.2018 | CY | 13.06.2018 | CZ | 13.06.2018 | DK | 13.06.2018 | EE | 13.06.2018 | ES | 13.06.2018 | FI | 13.06.2018 | HR | 13.06.2018 | IT | 13.06.2018 | LT | 13.06.2018 | LV | 13.06.2018 | MC | 13.06.2018 | MK | 13.06.2018 | NL | 13.06.2018 | PL | 13.06.2018 | PT | 13.06.2018 | RO | 13.06.2018 | RS | 13.06.2018 | SI | 13.06.2018 | SK | 13.06.2018 | SM | 13.06.2018 | TR | 13.06.2018 | BG | 13.09.2018 | NO | 13.09.2018 | GR | 14.09.2018 | IS | 13.10.2018 | IE | 25.10.2018 | LU | 25.10.2018 | MT | 25.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PT | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 25.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
MT | 25.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 25.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
MT | 25.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 25.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
MT | 25.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 25.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 25.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2011076788 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * example 4; table 1 *[A] 3; | [X]EP2372816 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0037] * * example 11; table 1 * * claims 1, 3 *; | [X]WO2012011247 (OSAKA TITANIUM TECHNOLOGIES CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]WO2012049826 (OSAKA TITANIUM TECHNOLOGIES CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [XI]EP2509139 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0043] * * examples 1, 2; table 1 * * claims 1, 3, 6, 8, 9 * [I] 3; | [XP]EP2597708 (OSAKA TITANIUM TECHNOLOGIES CO [JP]) [XP] 1-5 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * examples 1, 2; table 3 * * claims 1, 2, 4-6 *; | [XP]EP2618407 (OSAKA TITANIUM TECHNOLOGIES CO [JP]) [XP] 1-5 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0096] * * example 3; table 4 * * claims 1-4, 6, 7 * | International search | [X]JP2009301935 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]WO2012036127 (HITACHI MAXELL ENERGY LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JP2012094369 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [X]WO2012077268 (OSAKA TITANIUM TECHNOLOGIES CO [JP], et al); | [XP]JP2013110105 (TOYOTA IND CORP) | by applicant | JP3952180B | JP4171897B | JP2011090869 |