EP2911946 - BEVERAGE CONTAINER LID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enterprise Express Inc. 6701 Democracy Blvd. Suite 300 Bethesda, Maryland 20817 / US | [2017/43] |
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states Enterprise Express Inc. 25252 Riffleford Square Unit No.303 South Riding, VA 20152 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILAN, Michael P. O. Box 220265 Chantilly, VA 20153 / US | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Gill, Stephen Charles Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 13849333.3 | 23.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013US66324 | Priority number, date | US201213661431 | 26.10.2012 Original published format: US201213661431 | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014066474 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2911946 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2911946 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/02, B65D51/04, B65D47/06, B65D41/62 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
B65D43/0204 (EP,US);
A47G19/2272 (US);
A47G21/18 (US);
B29C49/0691 (US);
B65B15/02 (US);
B65B3/04 (US);
B65B7/26 (US);
B65B7/2842 (US);
B65D43/16 (US);
B65D47/06 (US);
B65D51/18 (US);
B29K2067/046 (US);
B29K2995/0088 (US);
B65D2251/0021 (US);
B65D2251/0028 (US);
B65D2251/0087 (US);
B65D2251/009 (US);
B65D2543/00046 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00351 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DECKEL FÜR GETRÄNKEBEHÄLTER | [2015/36] | English: | BEVERAGE CONTAINER LID | [2015/36] | French: | COUVERCLE DE RÉCIPIENT DE BOISSON | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 13.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.04.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2013 | AL | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MK | 21.12.2016 | PL | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | RS | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | SM | 21.12.2016 | BG | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | HR | 21.12.2016 | |
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6488173 (MILAN MICHAEL [US]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2004084452 (HSIEH WU-CHANG [TW]) [Y] 1-9,11-13 * paragraph [0041]; figure 8 *[A] 10,14; | [YDA]US2009108006 (MILAN MICHAEL [US]) [YD] 1-9,11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] - [0030] - [0031] - [0034] * [A] 10,14 | International search | [A]US4738376 (MARKUS RICHARD N [US]); | [A]US2002108922 (HIERZER VALENTIN [US]); | [A]JP2004352278 (TOTO SEIKEI KK, et al); | [A]US2008128382 (YAMAMOTO AKIRA [JP], et al); | [A]US2012248133 (DANKS CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al) |