EP2914060 - INDUCTION HEATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUROSE, Yoichi c/o Panasonic IP Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KITAIZUMI, Takeshi c/o Panasonic IP Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
FUJINAMI, Tomoya c/o Panasonic IP Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
MINATODANI, Junichi c/o Panasonic IP Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
NIIYAMA, Kohji c/o Panasonic IP Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 13849536.1 | 23.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013JP06264 | Priority number, date | JP20120235309 | 25.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012235309 | JP20130008140 | 21.01.2013 Original published format: JP 2013008140 | [2015/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014064931 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2914060 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/12, H05B6/06 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
H05B6/062 (EP);
H05B2213/03 (EP);
H05B2213/05 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/36] | H05B6/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Title | German: | INDUKTIONSHEIZVORRICHTUNG | [2015/36] | English: | INDUCTION HEATING DEVICE | [2015/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE À INDUCTION | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2015 | Translation filed | 26.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 18.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 06.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2863039 (BRANDT IND [FR]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 26; figures 1-3 * [I] 3-11; | [XI]EP2482613 (FAGORBRANDT SAS [FR]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0048]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0051] * [I] 3-11; | [XI]EP2509392 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1,7,9a * [I] 3-11; | [A]EP2034800 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102010031225 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0047] * | International search | [X]JP2008293871 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.); | [Y]JP2010153060 (PANASONIC CORP.); | [A]WO2012114405 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.); | [A]JP2008027728 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2012084286 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) | by applicant | DE102010028549 | EP1206164 |