EP2912428 - INTEGRITY TESTING APPARATUS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pall Technology UK Limited 5 Harbourgate Business Park Southampton Road Portsmouth P06 4BQ / GB | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERENTIEV, Alexandre 4688 Spring Creek Drive Lexington, KY 40515 / US | 02 /
TERENTIEV, Sergey 110 E. 1st Street Apt. 222 Chaska, MN 55318 / US | 03 /
PETHE, Vishwas 1668 Philipp Way Shakopee, MN 55379 / US | 04 /
PAGANELLI, Anthony 4956 Long Farm Ln Trenton, OH 45067 / US | 05 /
BHELLA, Richard 1414 S. Silverado Street Gilbert, AZ 85296 / US | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 13849681.5 | 24.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013US66614 | Priority number, date | US201261717959P | 24.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261717959 P | US201361790621P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361790621 P | US201361873138P | 03.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361873138 P | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014066637 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2912428 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/00, G01M3/02, G01M3/26 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
G01M3/229 (EP,US);
G01M3/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Title | German: | UNVERSEHRTHEITSPRÜFVORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2015/36] | English: | INTEGRITY TESTING APPARATUS AND RELATED METHODS | [2015/36] | French: | APPAREIL D'ESSAI D'INTÉGRITÉ ET PROCÉDÉS APPARENTÉS | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 14.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6082184 (LEHMANN MARTIN [CH]) [X] 1,5,9,12,17,18 * abstract * * column 9, lines 5-14 * [I] 2-4,6-8,10,11,13-16; | [A]US2010326172 (VOUTE NICOLAS [FR], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [XI]US2011011164 (TERENTIEV ALEXANDRE N [US], et al) [X] 1-3,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0046] , [ 0047] * [I] 4-14,17,18 | International search | [Y]JPH08247919 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]KR20050051109 (PISKO ENGINEERING CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2006275731 (SHIBUYA MACHINERY CO LTD); | [A]US2010326172 (VOUTE NICOLAS [FR], et al); | [X]US2011011164 (TERENTIEV ALEXANDRE N [US], et al) |