EP2913702 - HEAD-UP DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Seiki Co., Ltd. 2-34 Higashi-Zaoh 2-chome Nagaoka-shi, Niigata 940-8580 / JP | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
USHIDA, Norihiko Nippon Seiki, Co., Ltd 2-2-34 Higashi Zoah Nagaoka Nigata / JP | 02 /
OGURO, Yuji Nippon Seiki, Co., Ltd 2-2-34 Higashi Zoah Nagaoka Nigata / JP | 03 /
FURUSAWA, Hiroyuki Nippon Seiki, Co., Ltd 2-2-34 Higashi Zoah Nagaoka Nigata / JP | 04 /
JINUSHI, Kouichi Nippon Seiki, Co., Ltd 2-2-34 Higashi Zoah Nagaoka Nigata / JP | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 13849774.8 | 04.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013JP77073 | Priority number, date | JP20120234827 | 24.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012234827 | [2015/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014065097 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2913702 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2913702 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, B60K35/00, B60R11/02, G02B27/64, // B60R11/00 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
G02B27/0149 (EP,CN,US);
B60K35/00 (EP,CN,US);
B60K35/22 (EP,US);
B60K35/23 (EP,US);
B60K35/53 (EP,US);
B60R11/0235 (EP,US);
G02B27/646 (EP,US);
B60K2360/682 (EP,CN,US);
B60R2011/0085 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/23] | G02B27/01, B60K35/00, B60R11/02, G02B27/64 | ||
Former IPC [2015/36] | G02B27/01, B60K35/00, B60R11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLICKFELDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2015/36] | English: | HEAD-UP DISPLAY DEVICE | [2015/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À TÊTE HAUTE | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2015 | Translation filed | 30.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 24.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2013 | AL | 09.01.2019 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | ES | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | HR | 09.01.2019 | IT | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MK | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | PL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | RS | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | SM | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | NO | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | IE | 04.10.2019 | LU | 04.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 04.10.2019 | ||
LU | 04.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 04.10.2019 | ||
LU | 04.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 04.10.2019 | ||
LU | 04.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 04.10.2019 | ||
LU | 04.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
LU | 04.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH10227991 (SHIMADZU CORP) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1,6,7 * [A] 2,4; | [YA]JP2012163630 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0048]; figures 2-3 *[A] 2,4 | International search | [Y]JPH10227991 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]JP2002250343 (MINEBEA CO LTD); | [Y]JP2012163630 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | JP2008185790 |