EP2916004 - ELECTRIC COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Gento c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NISHII, Nobuyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
OGAWA, Nobuaki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
FUKUMOTO, Minoru c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/37] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2015/37] | Application number, filing date | 13850234.9 | 24.10.2013 | [2015/37] | WO2013JP06288 | Priority number, date | JP20120238652 | 30.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012238652 | JP20120279004 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012279004 | [2015/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014068914 | Date: | 08.05.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2916004 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/00, F04C29/00 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
F04B35/04 (EP,US);
H02K3/38 (US);
F01C21/10 (EP,US);
F04B39/121 (EP,US);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
H02K11/33 (EP,US);
H02K5/08 (EP,US);
H02K5/10 (EP,US);
H02K5/225 (EP,US);
H02K7/14 (US);
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C2240/803 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER VERDICHTER | [2015/37] | English: | ELECTRIC COMPRESSOR | [2015/37] | French: | ÉLECTRO-COMPRESSEUR | [2015/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2015 | Translation filed | 01.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/37] | 05.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]JP2010065625 (TOYOTA IND CORP, et al) [ID] 1-5* figures 1,2,3 * | International search | [A]JP3853779B (KABUSHIKI KAISHA SENSATA TECHNOLOGIES JAPAN); | [A]JP2009097503 (PANASONIC CORP); | [A]JP2011211876 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [A]JP2012184752 (TOYOTA IND CORP) | by applicant | JP2010065625 |