EP2916166 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortus Technology Co., Ltd. 2-8-7 Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | [2015/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI, Norihiro c/o Ortus Technology Co. Ltd. 2-8-7 Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Kunpei c/o Ortus Technology Co. Ltd. 2-8-7 Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | 03 /
MIZUSAKO, Ryota c/o Ortus Technology Co. Ltd. 2-8-7 Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | [2015/37] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2015/37] | Application number, filing date | 13850282.8 | 29.10.2013 | [2015/37] | WO2013JP79319 | Priority number, date | JP20120242715 | 02.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012242715 | [2015/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014069484 | Date: | 08.05.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2916166 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2916166 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1334, G02F1/1335, G02F1/1343, G02F1/1368, G02F1/1362 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
G02F1/133553 (EP,US);
G02F1/1334 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/133345 (US);
G02F1/133512 (US);
G02F1/136213 (EP,US);
G02F1/1368 (US);
G02F1/13345 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/136209 (CN);
G02F1/136222 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/37] | G02F1/1334, G02F1/1335, G02F1/1343, G02F1/1368 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2015/37] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE | [2015/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2015/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2015 | Translation filed | 13.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/37] | 10.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2013 | AL | 15.05.2019 | AT | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | ES | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | IT | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | NL | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | RS | 15.05.2019 | SE | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | GB | 29.10.2019 | IE | 29.10.2019 | LU | 29.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.10.2013 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
GB | 29.10.2019 | ||
IE | 29.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 29.10.2013 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
GB | 29.10.2019 | ||
IE | 29.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
GB | 29.10.2019 | ||
IE | 29.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
GB | 29.10.2019 | ||
IE | 29.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
GB | 29.10.2019 | ||
IE | 29.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
IE | 29.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 29.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 29.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]US2003122980 (JIN HYUN-SUK [KR], et al) [I] 1,8 * paragraphs [0065] - [0067] - [0074]; figure 8 * [A] 2-7,10 [Y] 9; | [IA]JP2003195350 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [I] 1-7,10 * paragraphs [0027] - [0033] - [0040] - [0044]; figures 1,2 * [A] 9; | [A]US2003164912 (EGUCHI SHINGO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]US2010309416 (GOTOH JUN [JP]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0050]; figure 2 * | International search | [A]JPH11133391 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [X]JP2000147493 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JP2010281925 (HITACHI DISPLAYS LTD); | [A]JP2011095407 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) | by applicant | JP3736076B | JP2011095407 |