EP2913133 - END MILL WITH COOLANT HOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 3-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKATA Koji c/o Akashi Plant Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 179-1 Nishioike Kanagasaki, Uozumicho Akashi-shi Hyogo 674-0071 / JP | 02 /
AZEGAMI Takayuki c/o Akashi Plant Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 179-1 Nishioike Kanagasaki, Uozumicho Akashi-shi Hyogo 674-0071 / JP | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 13850824.7 | 21.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013JP78436 | Priority number, date | JP20120237853 | 29.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012237853 | [2015/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014069265 | Date: | 08.05.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2913133 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2913133 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/28, B23C5/10 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
B23C5/28 (EP,CN,US);
B23C5/10 (EP,CN,US);
B23C2210/202 (EP,CN,US);
B23C2210/246 (US);
B23C2210/285 (EP,CN,US);
B23C2250/12 (US);
Y10T407/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FINGERFRÄSER MIT KÜHLUNGSLÖCHERN | [2015/36] | English: | END MILL WITH COOLANT HOLES | [2015/36] | French: | FRAISE EN BOUT AYANT DES TROUS DE FLUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2015 | Translation filed | 22.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 14.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2013 | AL | 26.04.2017 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | ES | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | RS | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | IE | 21.10.2017 | LU | 21.10.2017 | MT | 21.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 21.10.2013 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
MT | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.10.2013 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
MT | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 21.10.2013 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
MT | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 21.10.2013 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
MT | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.10.2013 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
MT | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
MT | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
MT | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP4409665B (OSG CORP) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2006239829 (TUNGALOY CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2007313632 (UNION TOOL KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2010214545 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2001025915 (OSG CORP.); | [A]JP2004276142 (NS TOOL CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2003505259 (SECO TOOLS AB. (PUBL)); | [A]JP2005502484 (HANITA METAL WORKS LTD.); | [A]JPH08290319 (HITACHI TOOL ENGINEERING LTD.); | [A]JP2003340626 (OMI KOGYO CO., LTD.); | [A]DE202009014216U (MAYER, JURGEN) | by applicant | JP3025383B | JP4409665B |