EP2845501 - SHOE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sung, Ho Dong 801-305 Sindo 8-cha Apts. 313-4 Gwangsa-dong Yangju-si, Gyeonggi-do 482-722 / KR | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Basra, Sandeep, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Basra, Sandeep Df-mp Dörries Frank-Moinia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13852453.3 | 15.07.2013 | WO2013KR06294 | Priority number, date | KR20120125266 | 07.11.2012 Original published format: KR 20120125266 | [2015/11] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014073768 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2845501 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/00, A43B17/00, A43C11/00, A43B7/18, A43B7/24 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
A43C11/004 (EP,US);
A43B3/00 (KR);
A43B1/02 (US);
A43B1/10 (US);
A43B17/00 (EP,KR,US);
A43B23/0235 (EP,US);
A43B23/0265 (EP,US);
A43B7/18 (EP,US);
A43B7/24 (EP,US);
A43C11/00 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | A43B3/00, A43B17/00, A43C11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Title | German: | SCHUH | [2015/11] | English: | SHOE | [2015/11] | French: | CHAUSSURE | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2014 | Translation filed | 01.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 29.04.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4811500 (MACCANO ANGELO [US]); | [X]EP1033088 (SALOMON SA [FR]); | [X]DE202004003720U (CHOLEWA UWE [DE]); | [X]US2012011744 (BELL THOMAS G [US], et al) | International search | [A]KR200393869Y ; | [A]KR20050103175 (LEE BONG JU [KR]); | [X]KR20090053257 (LEE HO JIN [KR]); | [A]KR20110088843 (LEE SANG OK [KR]) |