Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014371597 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414472200 | 28.08.2014 | US201261723114 | 06.11.2012 | US201313830202 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11090024 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2021 | B2 | US2019142370 | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916242900 | 08.01.2019 | US201414472200 | 28.08.2014 | US201261723114 | 06.11.2012 | US201313830202 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109938776 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201380069603 | 05.11.2013 | US201261723114 | 06.11.2012 | US201313830202 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105142488 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US68527 | 05.11.2013 | US201261723114 | 06.11.2012 | US201313830202 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2916710 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2016 | A4 | EP2916710 | 16.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US68527 | 05.11.2013 | US201261723114 | 06.11.2012 | US201313830202 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014074522 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2014 | A9 | WO2014074522 | 15.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261723114 | 06.11.2012 | US201313830202 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014128732 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261723114 | 06.11.2012 | US201313830202 | 14.03.2013 |