EP2919925 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPARTING SELECTED TOPOGRAPHIES TO ALUMINUM SHEET METAL AND APPLICATIONS THERE FOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/39] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPARTING SELECTED TOPOGRAPHIES TO ALUMINUM SHEET METAL AND APPLICATIONS THERE FOR | ||
[2018/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACR II Aluminium Group Cooperatief U.A. Prof J.H. Bavincklaan 2 1183 AT Amstelveen / NL | [2018/42] |
Former [2018/30] | For all designated states Arconic Inc. 201 Isabella Street Alcoa Corporate Center Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US | ||
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states Sheu, Shen 4134 Dundee Drive Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | ||
For all designated states Wise, Julie A. 1300 Clark Lane Natrona Heights, PA 15065 / US | |||
For all designated states Kasun, Tom J. 5903 Oak Hill Court Export, PA 15632 / US | |||
For all designated states Whittle, Neville C. 105 Pennwoods Court Irwin, PA 15642 / US | |||
For all designated states Epp, June M. 201 Fawn Court Pittsburgh, PA 15239 / US | |||
For all designated states Coleman, David E. 4020 Benden Circle Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | |||
For all designated states Panseri, Norman J. 235 Rizzi Drive Irwin, PA 15642 / US | |||
For all designated states Marcilla Gomis, Salvador A. c/ Tridente 18 BW 67 03540 Alicante / ES | |||
For all designated states Stewart, Patricia A. 1625 Bedford Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15219 / US | |||
For all designated states Armigliato, Antonio Via Marconi No. 7 31050 Villorba / IT | |||
For all designated states Iovane, Marco Via Paruta N-32 30172 Mestre / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEU, Shen 4134 Dundee Drive Murrysville PA 15668 / US | 02 /
WISE, Julie A. 1300 Clark Lane Natrona Heights PA 15065 / US | 03 /
KASUN, Tom J. 5903 Oak Hill Court Export PA 15632 / US | 04 /
WHITTLE, Neville C. 105 Pennwoods Court Irvin PA 15642 / US | 05 /
EPP, June M. 201 Fawn Court Pittsburgh PA 15239 / US | 06 /
COLEMAN, David E. 4020 Benden Circle Murrysville PA 15668 / US | 07 /
PANSERI, Norman J. 235 Rizzi Drive Irwin PA 15642 / US | 08 /
MARCILLA GOMIS, Salvador A. C/Tridente 18 Bw67 03540 Alicante / ES | 09 /
STEWART, Patricia A. 1625 Bedford Avenue Pittsburgh PA 15219 / US | 10 /
ARMIGLIATO, Antoinio Via Marconi 7 31050 Villorba / IT | 11 /
IOVANE, Marco Via Paruta N-32 30172 Mestre / IT | [2019/09] |
Former [2018/30] | 01 /
SHEU, Shen 414-34 Dundee Drive Murrysville PA 15668 / US | ||
02 /
WISE, Julie A. 1300 Clark Lane Natrona Heights PA 15065 / US | |||
03 /
KASUN, Tom J. 5903 Oak Hill Court Export PA 15632 / US | |||
04 /
WHITTLE, Neville C. 105 Pennwoods Court Irvin PA 15642 / US | |||
05 /
EPP, June M. 201 Fawn Court Pittsburgh PA 15239 / US | |||
06 /
COLEMAN, David E. 4020 Benden Circle Murrysville PA 15668 / US | |||
07 /
PANSERI, Norman J. 235 Rizzi Drive Irwin PA 15642 / US | |||
08 /
MARCILLA GOMIS, Salvador A. C/Tridente 18 Bw67 03540 Alicante / ES | |||
09 /
STEWART, Patricia A. 1625 Bedford Avenue Pittsburgh PA 15219 / US | |||
10 /
ARMIGLIATO, Antoinio Via Marconi 7 31050 Villorba / IT | |||
11 /
IOVANE, Marco Via Paruta N-32 30172 Mestre / IT | |||
Former [2015/39] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [2019/09] |
Former [2015/39] | Trinks, Ole Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13853281.7 | 08.11.2013 | [2015/39] | WO2013US69188 | Priority number, date | US201213673468 | 09.11.2012 Original published format: US201213673468 | US201313892028 | 10.05.2013 Original published format: US201313892028 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014074844 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2919925 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2919925 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/22, B21B27/00, B21H8/00, B24C1/06, C21D7/06, B65D88/28, B65D90/64 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
B21B1/227 (EP,KR);
B21B1/22 (RU);
B21B27/005 (EP,KR);
B21H8/005 (EP,KR);
B65D88/26 (EP,KR);
B21B2001/228 (EP,KR);
B21B2003/001 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/39] | B21B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTING UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINPRÄGEN AUSGEWÄHLTER TOPOGRAFIEN IN EIN ALUMINIUMBLECH UND ANWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2019/09] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPARTING SELECTED TOPOGRAPHIES TO ALUMINUM SHEET METAL AND APPLICATIONS THERE FOR | [2019/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GAUFRAGE DE TOPOGRAPHIES SÉLECTIONNÉES DANS UN MÉTAL EN FEUILLE D'ALUMINIUM ET APPLICATIONS POUR CEUX-CI | [2019/09] |
Former [2015/39] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINPRÄGEN AUSGEWÄHLTER TOPOGRAFIEN IN EIN ALUMINIUMBLECH UND ANWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2015/39] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPARTING SELECTED TOPOGRAPHIES TO ALUMINUM SHEET METAL AND APPLICATIONS THERE FOR | ||
Former [2015/39] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION DE TOPOGRAPHIES SÉLECTIONNÉES À UN MÉTAL EN FEUILLE D'ALUMINIUM ET APPLICATIONS POUR CEUX-CI | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 27.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2013 | AL | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | IE | 08.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 08.11.2013 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2986193 (PAT HOWELL); | [A]EP0279773 (BENECKE GMBH J [DE]); | [Y]WO9507774 (SIDMAR NV [BE], et al); | [Y]DE19947696 (LESK ADOLF [DE]); | International search | [A]US2361039 (LANGEL ADRIEN L); | [Y]US2986193 (PAT HOWELL); | [Y]US3824827 (STOCKBRIDGE B, et al); | [A]US5354581 (LAUBE HANS-JUERGEN [CH]); | [Y]WO9507774 (SIDMAR NV [BE], et al); | [Y]US5447404 (BJELKEBY STIG [SE]); | [Y]US2010239398 (BREY CHARLES G [US]) |