EP2919382 - POWER SOURCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI Tadanobu c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-Chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13854115.6 | 08.11.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013JP80191 | Priority number, date | JP20120247883 | 09.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012247883 | [2015/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014073632 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2919382 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02P27/06, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, H02J1/00, H02J1/10, B60L7/14, H02J7/00, H02P5/74, H02P23/00 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
H02P27/06 (EP,CN,US);
B60L7/14 (EP,CN,US);
H02P23/00 (US);
B60L50/51 (EP,CN,US);
B60L58/19 (EP,US);
H02J7/0024 (EP,CN,US);
H02P5/74 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2210/30 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2210/42 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2220/42 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2240/526 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2240/527 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2240/529 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2240/547 (EP,CN,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/38] | H02P27/06, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, H02J1/00, H02J1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Title | German: | STROMQUELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2015/38] | English: | POWER SOURCE DEVICE | [2015/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF SOURCE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2015 | Translation filed | 03.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 14.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 21.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008131830 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-5 * figure 5; claims 1-7 *; | [A]JP2010057288 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-5 * figures 3,4; claims 1-8 *; | [A]JP2010183768 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-5 * figure 3; claim 1- *; | [AD]JP2012060838 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [AD] 1-5* figure 1; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US2012187887 (SONE TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] , [0070] , [0107] , [0114]; figures 1,8 *; | [A]US2012187755 (SONE TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]JP2012060838 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2012152079 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2012060838 | JP2012070514 |