EP2920995 - CONTROL SIGNALLING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Phong c/o NEC Australia Pty. Ltd. 649-655 Springvale Road Mulgrave, Victoria 3170 / AU | 02 /
LAN, Yuanrong c/o NEC Australia Pty. Ltd. 649-655 Springvale Road Mulgrave, Victoria 3170 / AU | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/39] | Application number, filing date | 13855231.0 | 30.08.2013 | [2015/39] | WO2013JP05137 | Priority number, date | AU20120905006 | 14.11.2012 Original published format: AU 2012905006 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014076857 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2920995 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, // H04L1/18 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
H04L1/0061 (EP,US);
H04W74/002 (US);
H04B7/15557 (US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/39] | H04W28/06, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSIGNALISIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/39] | English: | CONTROL SIGNALLING METHOD | [2015/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX DE COMMANDE | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 30.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012019348 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [X] - SAMSUNG, "Dynamic reconfiguration of TDD UL-DL configuration", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122267 DYNAMIC RECONFIGURATION OF TDD UL-DL CONFIGURATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050600530 [X] 1-14 * section 2 * | International search | [Y]JP2010539847 (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [Y] 8-25* , paragraphs 0067, 0094 & WO 2009/041785 A2 & JP 5048839 B2 & EP 2193615 A2 & KR 10-2009-0033126 A & CN 101809897 A & ES 2393232 T3 *; | [XY]WO2012029244 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4, 7 * , Claims 1-3, paragraphs 0004, 0005, 0012, 0022, 0023, 0032, 0033, 0057-0059, 0085-0090, 0107-0124, 0168-0173 & US 2013/0148623 A1 & CN 103069905 A * [Y] 5, 6, 8-25; | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "Dynamic reconfiguration of TDD UL-DL configuration", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #69 Rl-122267, (20120521), XP050600530 [Y] 5, 6, 8-25 | [Y] - HUAWEI et al., "Methods to support different time scales for TDD UL-DL reconfiguration", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #69 Rl-122909, (20120521), XP050601178 [Y] 8-25 |