EP2921345 - VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TS Tech Co., Ltd. 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-0012 / JP | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO Teppei c/o TS TECH CO. LTD. 118-1 Oaza Ota Takanezawa-machi Shioya-gun Tochigi 329-1217 / JP | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 13855556.0 | 15.11.2013 | [2015/39] | WO2013JP80865 | Priority number, date | JP20120252363 | 16.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012252363 | JP20120252367 | 16.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012252367 | JP20120252383 | 16.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012252383 | JP20120252378 | 16.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012252378 | [2015/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014077349 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2921345 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/68, A47C7/02, A47C7/28, B60N2/16, B60N2/427, B60N2/72 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
B60N2/72 (EP,CN,US);
B60N2/682 (US);
B60N2/002 (US);
B60N2/0034 (EP,CN);
B60N2/1615 (EP,CN,US);
B60N2/1675 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSITZ | [2015/39] | English: | VEHICLE SEAT | [2015/39] | French: | SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2015 | Translation filed | 11.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 26.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 03.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2000308544 (ARACO CORP); | [IAY]EP1179308 (TS TECH CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2008131228 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]); | [A]DE102010010604 (ISRINGHAUSEN GEB [DE]); | [A]US2012068506 (YAMAKI JOGEN [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012084144 (SITECH SITZTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) | International search | [Y]JPS581361U ; | [Y]JPH10287196 (ARACO CORP); | [Y]JP2000308544 (ARACO CORP); | [Y]WO0139632 (TS TECH CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2006051272 (TOYOTA BOSHOKU CORP); | [A]JP2008067724 (TS TEC KK) | by applicant | JP2004306869 | JP2006096239 | JP2006182039 |