EP2920522 - FLUID HEATER FOR A PUMPING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graco Minnesota Inc. 88 11th Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55413-1894 / US | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCORMICK, Martin, P. 21830 Iden Avenue Forest Lake, Minnesota 55025 / US | 02 /
BUTLER, Ryan, F. 7717 Kentucky Avenue North Brooklyn Park, Minnesota 55445 / US | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2015/39] | Application number, filing date | 13855942.2 | 13.11.2013 | [2015/39] | WO2013US69841 | Priority number, date | US201261726371P | 14.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261726371 P | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014078381 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2920522 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/00, F24H1/10, F24H1/20, F24H1/12, B05B1/24, B05B7/16, F24H1/14, F24H9/00, F24H9/18, F24H9/20, H05B3/48, H05B3/78 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
F24H1/121 (EP,US);
F24H1/142 (US);
B05B1/24 (US);
H05B3/48 (EP,US);
H05B3/78 (EP,US);
B05B7/16 (EP,US);
F24H2250/02 (EP,US);
F24H9/0021 (EP,US);
F24H9/1818 (EP,US);
H05B2203/021 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/39] | F24H1/00, F24H1/10, F24H1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSERHITZER FÜR EIN PUMPSYSTEM | [2015/39] | English: | FLUID HEATER FOR A PUMPING SYSTEM | [2015/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE DE FLUIDE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE POMPAGE | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 18.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/44] | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4465922 (KOLIBAS JAMES A [US]) [YD] 4,8,9,11-13 * column 2 - column 4; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP1532905 (STEINER AG WEGGIS [CH]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,14,15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0011] , [0013] , [0017]; figure 2 * [Y] 4,8,9,11-13; | [A]US7286752 (GOURAND THIERRY [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]WO2009043851 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 19 - page 5, line 22; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2012183281 (SATO HIDENORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7 * figures 1a,3a, * | International search | [YA]US4465922 (KOLIBAS JAMES A [US]) [Y] 1-3, 5, 14, 16 * See abstract, column 4 lines 15-19, claims 1,6,8,9, and figure. * [A] 4, 6-13, 15, 17-21; | [A]US6459854 (YOAKIM ALFRED [CH], et al) [A] 1-21 * See abstract, claims 1,2,5,12, and figure 1. *; | [YA]US7286752 (GOURAND THIERRY [FR]) [Y] 1-3, 5, 14, 16 * See abstract, column 4 lines 12-15, claims 2,4,7,8,12, and figure 1. * [A] 4, 6-13, 15, 17-21; | [A]US2010046934 (JOHNSON GREGG C [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * See abstract, claim 1, and figure 1a. *; | [A]US2010282090 (ETTER STEFAN [CH], et al) [A] 1-21* See abstract, claims 21,24,25, and figures 3,6. * |