EP2924049 - TROPHIC HORMONE FUSION PROTEIN, PREPARATION METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Alphamab Co., Ltd Bldg C23, Biobay 218 Xinghu Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu, 215125 / CN | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Ting Bldg C23 Biobay 218 Xinghu Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215125 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Kangping Bldg C23 Biobay 218 Xinghu Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215125 / CN | 03 /
YUN, Lihong Bldg C23 Biobay 218 Xinghu Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215125 / CN | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 13856451.3 | 22.11.2013 | [2015/40] | WO2013CN87676 | Priority number, date | CN201210476665 | 22.11.2012 Original published format: CN201210476665 | [2015/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014079384 | Date: | 30.05.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2924049 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2924049 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/59, C07K19/00, C12N15/63, C12N15/62, C12N15/16, A61K38/24, A61K38/00 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
C07K14/59 (EP,US);
A61K38/24 (US);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | C07K14/59, C07K19/00, C12N15/63, C12N15/62, C12N15/16, A61K38/24, A61K47/48, A61P15/08, A61K38/00 | ||
Former IPC [2015/40] | C07K14/59, C07K19/00, C12N15/63, C12N15/62, C12N15/16, A61K38/24, A61K47/48, A61P15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TROPHISCHES HORMONFUSIONSPROTEIN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2015/40] | English: | TROPHIC HORMONE FUSION PROTEIN, PREPARATION METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2015/40] | French: | PROTÉINE DE FUSION DE L'HORMONE TROPHIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET APPLICATION ASSOCIÉS | [2015/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2015 | Translation filed | 03.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 12.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2013 | AL | 18.04.2018 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | PL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | RS | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | SM | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | NO | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | MT | 22.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 22.11.2013 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MK | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005073383 (SYNTONIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 6 * * page 11, line 26 - page 13, line 23 * * example 2 *; | [X] - DUMONT JENNIFER A ET AL, "MONOMERIC FC FUSIONS: IMPACT ON PHARMACOKINETIC AND BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF PROTEIN THERAPEUTICS", BIODRUGS: CLINICAL IMMUNOTHERAPEUTICS, BIOPHARMACEUTICALS AND GENE THERAPY, ADIS INTERNATIONAL, FR, (20060101), vol. 20, no. 3, doi:10.2165/00063030-200620030-00002, ISSN 1173-8804, pages 151 - 160, XP009082835 [X] 1,2,5-7,9-12 * abstract * * page 158 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00063030-200620030-00002 | International search | [X]CN1926237 (SYNTONIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [XP]WO2013010840 (ARTS BIOLOG AS [DK], et al); | [X] - LOW, S.C. ET AL., "Oral and pulmonary delivery of FSH-Fc fusion proteins via neonatal Fc receptor-mediated transcytosis.", HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (20050407), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 1805 - 1813, XP002455704 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humrep/deh896 | by applicant | EP0211894 | US4840896 | EP0322438 | US4923805 | US5155027 | US5156957 | US5338835 | US5428130 | US5480981 | US5585345 | US5639640 | US5808029 | US2005186662 | US7740862 | - Chinese Pharmacopoeia, (2010), vol. II |