Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2923452 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2923452



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(64)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 342
12.06.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
05.06.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
05.06.2019 Means of redress Search / examination 2
03.06.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
03.06.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.06.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.06.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.06.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.05.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.11.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
05.11.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
05.11.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
05.11.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
27.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.06.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.03.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.03.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.11.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
23.11.2017 Description Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.07.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
28.09.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
28.09.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
28.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
28.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.03.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 6
02.03.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
18.02.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
25.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.01.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
25.01.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
25.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.09.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
15.07.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.06.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
29.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.05.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.04.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 86
17.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 73
30.05.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
30.05.2014 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 48