Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9861592 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2018 | B2 | US2014142194 | 22.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | US201314086815 | 21.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102088078B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2020 | B1 | KR20150087844 | 30.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | WO2013US70625 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6407876B | Global Dossier | 17.10.2018 | B2 | JP2016500074 | 07.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | WO2013US70625 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104968339B | Global Dossier | 11.06.2019 | B | CN104968339 | 07.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | WO2013US70625 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2892084 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | C | CA2892084 | 30.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | WO2013US70625 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013348248B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2018 | B2 | AU2013348248 | 02.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | WO2013US70625 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2922534 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2020 | B1 | EP2922534 | 11.05.2016 | A4 | EP2922534 | 30.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | WO2013US70625 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015011798 | 11.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | WO2013US70625 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2788598T | 22.10.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | WO2013US70625 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1215548 | 02.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | WO2013US70625 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015006337 | 07.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | WO2013US70625 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201504292 | 26.04.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | WO2013US70625 | 18.11.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014081675 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI559917B | 01.12.2016 | B | TW201440758 | 01.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261729295 | 21.11.2012 |