EP2925888 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER
[Right-click to bookmark this link]
| Status | No opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on 31.08.2018
Database last updated on 03.10.2024
| Former | The patent has been granted
Status updated on 22.09.2017
|
Former | Grant of patent is intended
Status updated on 16.05.2017
|
Former | Examination is in progress
Status updated on 10.02.2017
|
Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CY | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907
/ US
| [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUMWAY, Stuart Denham
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston Massachusetts 02115-5727
/ US
| [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Jaap, David Robert
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
120 Moorgate
London, EC2M 6UR
/ GB
| [N/P] | Former [2017/43] | Jaap, David Robert
MSD
Hertford Road
Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU
/ GB
|
Former [2015/41] | Jaap, David Robert
MSD Hertford Road
Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU
/ GB
|
Application number, filing date | 13858495.8 | 22.11.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013US71377 | Priority number, date | US201261730795P | 28.11.2012
Original published format: US 201261730795 P | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type:
| A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014085216 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type:
| A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2925888 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Type:
| B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2925888 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, A61K31/519, C12Q1/68
| [2017/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K38/43 (RU);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (US);
(+)
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
G01N2333/91011 (US)
(-)
| | Former IPC [2016/19] | C12Q1/68, A61K31/519 |
| Former IPC [2015/41] | C12Q1/68 |
Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Extension states | BA | 29.06.2015 | ME | 29.06.2015 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2015/41] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER | [2015/41] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR TRAITER LE CANCER | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | | 29.06.2015 | Search fee paid | | 29.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 29.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | | Examination procedure | 29.06.2015 | Examination requested
[2015/41] | 11.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is
13.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court |
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
|
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
|
Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | [2021/32] | Former [2020/34] | AL | 25.10.2017 |
CY | 25.10.2017 |
MC | 25.10.2017 |
Former [2018/36] | CY | 25.10.2017 |
MC | 25.10.2017 |
Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011092520
(FURUKAWA SHUNTARO [JP], et al); | | [Y]WO2012074754
(ARRAY BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al); | | [A]US2012172370
(PETROVA ROSITZA [US], et al); | | by applicant | US2789118 | | US2990401 | | US3048581 | | US3126375 | | US3749712 | | US3928326 | | US3929768 | | US3996359 | | US4231938 | | US4294926 | | US4319039 | | US4346227 | | US4410629 | | US4444784 | | US4537859 | | US4681893 | | US4683202 | | US4782084 | | US4820850 | | US4885314 | | US4911165 | | EP0360390 | | US4916239 | | US4929437 | | WO9005525 | | WO9005729 | | EP0394989 | | EP0428434 | | EP0429366 | | EP0430771 | | US5030447 | | EP0436334 | | WO9109844 | | EP0443132 | | WO9118899 | | WO9201688 | | WO9206079 | | EP0482539 | | US5118853 | | WO9212151 | | US5134142 | | EP0498069 | | EP0499313 | | US5143854 | | WO9215585 | | WO9217449 | | US5162339 | | EP0512901 | | EP0512902 | | EP0514273 | | EP0514274 | | EP0514275 | | EP0514276 | | WO9220661 | | WO9220676 | | EP0515681 | | EP0517589 | | WO9221677 | | WO9222569 | | EP0520555 | | US5177080 | | WO9300330 | | WO9300331 | | EP0522808 | | WO9301159 | | WO9301165 | | WO9301169 | | WO9301170 | | US5189164 | | EP0528495 | | EP0532456 | | EP0533280 | | WO9306099 | | EP0536817 | | WO9309116 | | WO9310073 | | EP0545478 | | WO9314084 | | WO9314113 | | US5232929 | | EP0558156 | | US5242974 | | US5242930 | | WO9318023 | | WO9319064 | | WO9321155 | | WO9321181 | | GB2266529 | | WO9323380 | | WO9324465 | | US5273995 | | EP0577394 | | WO9400440 | | WO9401402 | | GB2268931 | | GB2269170 | | WO9402461 | | WO9402595 | | GB2269590 | | WO9403429 | | WO9403445 | | US5288644 | | US5290946 | | WO9404494 | | WO9404496 | | EP0585913 | | WO9405625 | | EP0590152 | | WO9407843 | | GB2271774 | | WO9408997 | | WO9410165 | | WO9410167 | | WO9410168 | | WO9410170 | | WO9411368 | | EP0599538 | | WO9413639 | | WO9413663 | | US5324633 | | EP0604181 | | WO9414767 | | WO9415932 | | WO9415903 | | EP0610793 | | US5342952 | | WO9419357 | | WO9419320 | | WO9419323 | | US5344991 | | WO9420500 | | EP0618221 | | US5354772 | | US5356896 | | WO9426735 | | WO9426740 | | US5373003 | | WO9429309 | | US5380738 | | EP0634402 | | US5384261 | | WO9502595 | | US5387595 | | WO9504040 | | WO9504042 | | US5393790 | | WO9506645 | | WO9507886 | | WO9507908 | | WO9508542 | | WO9508549 | | US5405783 | | WO9510514 | | WO9510515 | | WO9510516 | | US5409944 | | US5412087 | | WO9511917 | | WO9511880 | | WO9512612 | | WO9512572 | | WO9514017 | | US5420245 | | WO9515311 | | US5424186 | | WO9516679 | | WO9517382 | | US5429807 | | WO9518124 | | WO9518129 | | US5432049 | | WO9519344 | | US5436327 | | US5436265 | | WO9520575 | | WO9521819 | | WO9522525 | | US5445934 | | WO9523798 | | WO9524612 | | WO9525086 | | EP0675112 | | WO9526338 | | US5459270 | | WO9528418 | | US5466823 | | WO9530674 | | WO9530687 | | US5470710 | | US5472672 | | WO9532987 | | US5474995 | | EP0686629 | | WO9533744 | | WO9534535 | | WO9600736 | | EP0693489 | | EP0694535 | | US5489691 | | EP0696593 | | GB2292144 | | US5492806 | | WO9605529 | | WO9605168 | | WO9605169 | | WO9605181 | | WO9605193 | | WO9605203 | | US5494926 | | WO9606138 | | WO9606193 | | WO9606094 | | US5496833 | | EP0699655 | | EP0699674 | | WO9607649 | | GB2293168 | | GB2293169 | | US5503980 | | WO9610562 | | EP0707006 | | US5510270 | | US5510510 | | EP0708101 | | EP0709375 | | EP0709376 | | WO9616443 | | US5523430 | | EP0714891 | | WO9616939 | | US5525464 | | WO9617861 | | US5527681 | | WO9618643 | | US5529756 | | US5532359 | | WO9620197 | | US5536752 | | WO9621701 | | WO9621456 | | WO9621661 | | WO9622278 | | EP0723959 | | US5545531 | | WO9624611 | | WO9624612 | | US5547839 | | US5550142 | | US5554501 | | US5556752 | | EP0733632 | | WO9629304 | | WO9629317 | | WO9629326 | | WO9629328 | | US5561071 | | WO9630343 | | WO9630017 | | WO9630018 | | WO9630362 | | WO9630363 | | WO9631111 | | WO9631477 | | WO9631478 | | WO9631501 | | WO9631214 | | WO9632385 | | WO9633159 | | US5569588 | | US5571639 | | US5571792 | | WO9634850 | | WO9634851 | | WO9637489 | | US5580732 | | US5589485 | | WO9700252 | | US5593839 | | WO9701553 | | WO9701554 | | GB2302689 | | WO9703047 | | WO9703050 | | WO9702920 | | WO9703066 | | US5602098 | | WO9704785 | | US5604260 | | WO9708144 | | WO9714671 | | US5624711 | | WO9717070 | | WO9717362 | | US5631734 | | WO9718206 | | US5633272 | | WO9718813 | | WO9719084 | | EP0776893 | | WO9719942 | | US5637699 | | WO9721701 | | WO9721702 | | WO9723478 | | WO9726246 | | WO9730053 | | US5661028 | | US5661152 | | WO9738665 | | WO9744350 | | US5698584 | | US5700637 | | US5710140 | | WO9802436 | | US5719147 | | US5744305 | | US5770456 | | US5770722 | | WO9828980 | | WO9829119 | | US5807522 | | US5837832 | | US5848659 | | US5856101 | | US5861419 | | US5874219 | | US5885837 | | US5919523 | | US5932598 | | US6001843 | | US6020343 | | US6022963 | | US6069134 | | WO0030651 | | US6077674 | | WO0044777 | | WO0050032 | | WO0061186 | | US6156501 | | US6284781 | | US6288237 | | WO0170677 | | WO0190084 | | WO0230912 | | WO0236555 | | WO0247671 | | WO02081435 | | WO02081433 | | WO02083064 | | WO02083139 | | WO02083140 | | WO02083138 | | WO03013526 | | WO03013506 | | WO03018543 | | US6551784 | | WO03032809 | | WO03035048 | | WO03039460 | | WO03050064 | | WO03050122 | | WO03049527 | | WO03049679 | | WO03049678 | | WO03079973 | | WO03084473 | | WO03086404 | | WO03086279 | | WO03086394 | | WO03086403 | | WO03093252 | | WO03093264 | | WO03093251 | | WO03093253 | | WO03099211 | | WO03105855 | | WO03106417 | | WO2004031137 | | WO2004031139 | | WO2004031138 | | WO2004037171 | | WO2004039774 | | WO2004039800 | | WO2004039370 | | WO2004041162 | | US2004102360 | | US2004116432 | | WO2004058148 | | WO2004058700 | | WO2004089911 | | WO2004096131 | | WO2004096129 | | WO2004096135 | | WO2004096130 | | WO2004101538 | | WO2004101539 | | WO2004112699 | | US2005029941 | | WO2005014553 | | WO2005017190 | | US2005044294 | | US2005043361 | | WO2005018638 | | WO2005019206 | | WO2005019205 | | WO2005018547 | | WO2005030731 | | US2005176776 | | WO2005100356 | | WO2005100344 | | WO2006091395 | | WO2006110638 | | WO2006135627 | | WO2007076128 | | WO2007076129 | | WO2007126122 | | WO2007126128 | | WO2008153207 | | WO2009151997 | | US2010124544 | | US7834019 | | WO2011034743 | | US2011092520 | | US2011135601 | | US2012172370 | | US20000235708 | | US20000244697 | | US20010782856 | | US20040957251 |
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.