EP2926180 - CLAD MODE STRIPPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPG Photonics Corporation 50 Old Webster Road Oxford, Massachusetts 01540 / US | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VICTOR, Llyashenko Ipg Photonics Corporation 50 Old Webster Road Oxford, MA 01540 / US | 02 /
BARSEGUIAN, Karina Ipg Photonics Corporation 50 Old Webster Road Oxford, MA 01540 / US | 03 /
KLEBANOV, Leonid Ipg Photonics Corporation 50 Old Webster Road Oxford, MA 01540 / US | 04 /
DROZHZHIN, Anton Ipg Photonics Corporation 50 Old Webster Road Oxford, MA 01540 / US | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Kobiako von Gamm, Iouri Kobiako-von Gamm Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Bruckmannstraße 13 80638 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | Kobiako von Gamm, Iouri Bettinger Scheffelt Kobiako von Gamm Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnergesellschaft mbB Bavariaring 14 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13859110.2 | 27.11.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013US72223 | Priority number, date | US201261730798P | 28.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261730798 P | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014085583 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2926180 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/245 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
G02B6/02052 (EP,US);
H01S3/067 (US);
H01S3/06754 (EP,US);
H01S3/091 (US);
H01S3/10023 (EP,US);
H01S3/302 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Title | German: | MANTELMODENABSTREIFER | [2015/41] | English: | CLAD MODE STRIPPER | [2015/41] | French: | SUPPRESSEUR DE MODE DE GAINE | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 01.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2024 | 10.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007172174 (SCERBAK DAVID G [US], et al); | [X]US8027555 (KLINER DAHV [US], et al); | [X]GB2482867 (GSI GROUP LTD [GB]); | [X]US2012070115 (LANGSETH JASON E [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2002186921 (SCHUMACHER LYNN C [CA], et al); | [A]US2004036955 (DIGONNET MICHEL J F [US], et al); | [Y]US2010135339 (MELESHKEVICH MIKHAIL [US], et al); | [A]KR20120085729 (IPG PHOTONICS CORP [US]); | [A]WO2012122012 (COHERENT INC [US], et al) |