EP2926366 - FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR, DISPLAY ELEMENT, IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONE, Yuji c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Naoyuki c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Yuki c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
TAKADA, Mikiko c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
MATSUMOTO, Shinji c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
SAOTOME, Ryoichi c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 07 /
ARAE, Sadanori c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 08 /
ABE, Yukiko c/o RicohCompany Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2019/48] |
Former [2015/41] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13859244.9 | 27.11.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013JP82512 | Priority number, date | JP20120262079 | 30.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012262079 | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014084406 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2926366 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2926366 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/786, H01L27/12, G09G3/30, G09G3/34, G09G3/38, G09G3/36 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
H01L29/78606 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/7869 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09D1/00 (US);
C09D7/61 (US);
G09G3/30 (US);
G09G3/344 (US);
G09G3/348 (US);
G09G3/3696 (US);
G09G3/38 (US);
H01L27/1225 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L27/124 (US);
H01L27/1244 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/48] | H01L29/786, H01L27/12 | ||
Former IPC [2015/41] | H01L21/336, H01L29/786, H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FELDEFFEKTTRANSISTOR, ANZEIGEELEMENT, BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM | [2015/41] | English: | FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR, DISPLAY ELEMENT, IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE, AND SYSTEM | [2015/41] | French: | TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP, ÉLÉMENT D'AFFICHAGE, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE, ET SYSTÈME | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 10.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2013 | AL | 27.11.2019 | AT | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | CZ | 27.11.2019 | DK | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | ES | 27.11.2019 | FI | 27.11.2019 | HR | 27.11.2019 | IE | 27.11.2019 | IT | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LU | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | MK | 27.11.2019 | MT | 27.11.2019 | NL | 27.11.2019 | PL | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | RS | 27.11.2019 | SE | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | SM | 27.11.2019 | TR | 27.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | BG | 27.02.2020 | NO | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | PT | 19.04.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/26] | HU | 27.11.2013 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.11.2013 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 27.11.2013 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009081885 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0059] , [0065] , [0134] *; | [A]US2011057188 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0056]; figure 1D *; | [XI]US2011108863 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0044] , [0070]; figure 1 * [I] 2-8; | [A]JP2012216780 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 5,6* paragraphs [0098] - [0106] * | International search | [X]WO2009081885 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al); | TW200943552 [ ] (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]); | KR20100094535 [ ] (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]); | US2010276688 [ ] (YANO KOKI [JP], et al); | CN101911303 [ ] (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | WO2012133915 [ ] (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2012216780 (RICOH CO LTD); | TW201249748 [ ] (RICOH CO LTD [JP]); | JP2013080929 [ ] (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | US2013140175 [ ] (YANO KOKI [JP], et al) | Examination | JP2009230953 | US2010133591 |