EP2926148 - MULTIPLE METER DETECTION AND PROCESSING USING MOTION DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Nielsen Company (US), LLC 150 North Martingale Road Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAIN, Anand 3253 Halcyon Court Ellicott City, Maryland 20143 / US | 02 /
STAVROPOULOS, John 56 Frost Avenue West Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US | 03 /
NEUHAUSER, Alan 1512 Flora Court Silver Spring, Maryland 20910 / US | 04 /
LYNCH, Wendell 907 Southlawn East Lansing, Michigan 48823 / US | 05 /
KUZNETSOV, Vladimir 3317 Coventry Court Drive Ellicott City, Maryland 21042 / US | 06 /
CRYSTAL, Jack 11 Supreme Court Owings Mills, Maryland 21117 / US | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2015/41] | Application number, filing date | 13859416.3 | 12.08.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013US54501 | Priority number, date | US201213691166 | 30.11.2012 Original published format: US201213691166 | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014084928 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2926148 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2926148 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/00, G06Q30/02, A61B5/117, A61B5/11, // A61B5/00 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP);
A61B5/1118 (EP);
A61B5/117 (EP);
G06Q30/0201 (EP);
A61B5/6898 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/41] | G01P15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG VON MEHREREN MESSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERARBEITUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON BEWEGUNGSDATEN | [2015/41] | English: | MULTIPLE METER DETECTION AND PROCESSING USING MOTION DATA | [2015/41] | French: | DÉTECTION DE DISPOSITIFS DE MESURE MULTIPLES ET TRAITEMENT ASSOCIÉ AU MOYEN DE DONNÉES DE MOUVEMENT | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 17.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.01.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19180491.3 / EP3567377 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 14.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 14.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2013 | AL | 31.07.2019 | AT | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | ES | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | HR | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | MK | 31.07.2019 | MT | 31.07.2019 | PL | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | RS | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | SM | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | IE | 12.08.2019 | LU | 12.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | NO | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 12.08.2013 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
MT | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 12.08.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.08.2013 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 12.08.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 12.08.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 12.08.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 12.08.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | |
NO | 31.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008091087 (NEUHAUSER ALAN R [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0143] * * paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0169] * * paragraph [0175] *; | [A]US2012245978 (JAIN ANAND [US], et al) [A] 4 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0091] * | [A] - ALICJA OSSOWSKA, "One-bit Quantization for Synthetic Aperture Radar with DBF", SYNTHETIC APERTURE RADAR (EUSAR), 2008 7TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON, Friedrichshafen, Germany, ISBN 978-3-8007-3084-7, (20080602), XP002758796 [A] 2,6 * Section 3 * | International search | [Y]US2008091087 (NEUHAUSER ALAN R [US], et al); | [Y]US2010235527 (PELTON GREGORY [US], et al); | [Y]US2006080551 (MANTYJARVI JANI [FI], et al); | [Y]US2011106587 (LYNCH WENDELL [US], et al); | [Y]US2009132197 (RUBIN ANDREW E [US], et al); | [A]US2009171616 (ZHANG JAMES [US], et al); | [Y] - SPRAGER ET AL., "A Cumulant-Based Method for Gait Identification Using Accelerometer", DATA WITH PRINCIPAL COMPONENT ANALYSIS AND SUPPORT VECTOR MACHINE., (2000), URL: http://www.wseas.us/e-library/transactions/signal/2009/89-152.pdf, (20140120), XP002598139 | [A] - NOWLAN., "Human Identification via Gait Recognition Using Accelerometer Gyro Forces.", (2009), URL: http://cs-www.cs.yale.edu/homes/mfn3/pub/mfn_gait_id.pdf, (20140120), XP005175906 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eplepsyres.2005.09.004 | Examination | - DAVRONDZHON GAFUROV ET AL, "Biometric Gait Authentication Using Accelerometer Sensor", JOURNAL OF COMPUTERS, FI, (20061101), vol. 1, no. 7, doi:10.4304/jcp.1.7.51-59, ISSN 1796-203X, XP055450065 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4304/jcp.1.7.51-59 | - JONATHAN LESTER ET AL, Are You with Me? - Using Accelerometers to Determine If Two Devices Are Carried by the Same Person, PERVASIVE COMPUTING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 33 - 50, (20040323), ISBN 978-3-540-21835-7, XP019004333 |