EP2928735 - DUAL-SPEED AUTO-SHIFT LANDING GEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jost International Corp. 1770 Hayes Road Grand Haven, MI 49417 / US | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OESTREICH, Brian E. 1512-6 Bluebird Road Grand Haven, Michigan 49417 / US | 02 /
NORDLING, Kyle William 3443 Limestone Lane 321 Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | 03 /
MADSEN, Ben 597B Heritage Village Southbury, CT 06488 / US | 04 /
JOHNS, Steven 470 North Main St., Apt.1 Oshkosh, Wisconsin 54901 / US | 05 /
GUAN, Minglei 2105G Woodmar Drive Houghton, Michigan 49931 / US | [2016/04] |
Former [2015/48] | 01 /
OESTREICH, Brian E. 1512-6 Bluebird Road Grand Haven, Michigan 49417 / US | ||
02 /
NORDLING, Kyle William 3443 Limestone Lane 321 Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | |||
03 /
MADSEN, Ben 6940 Ashwood Road Apartment 309 Woodbury, Michigan 55125 / US | |||
04 /
JOHNS, Steven 470 North Main St., Apt.1 Oshkosh, Wisconsin 54901 / US | |||
05 /
GUAN, Minglei 2105G Woodmar Drive Houghton, Michigan 49931 / US | |||
Former [2015/42] | 01 /
OESTREICH, Brian E. 1512-6 Bluebird Road Grand Haven, Michigan 49417 / US | ||
02 /
NORDLING, Kyle William 3443 Limestone Lane 321 Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | |||
03 /
MADSEN, Ben 1301 Ruby Avenue Houghton, Michigan 49931 / US | |||
04 /
JOHNS, Steven 4012 Town Lakes Avenue 8315 Appleton, Wisconsin 54913 / US | |||
05 /
GUAN, Minglei 2105G Woodmar Drive Houghton, Michigan 49931 / US | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 6145 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bahnhofstraße 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2015/42] | Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Bahnhofstraße 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 13860227.1 | 04.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013US73134 | Priority number, date | US201261733245P | 04.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261733245 P | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014089220 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928735 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2928735 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60S9/08 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
B60S9/08 (EP,CN,US);
F16H2718/18 (US);
Y10T74/18784 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | B60S9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCH VERSTELLBARES FAHRWERK MIT ZWEI GESCHWINDIGKEITEN | [2015/42] | English: | DUAL-SPEED AUTO-SHIFT LANDING GEAR | [2015/42] | French: | BÉQUILLE À CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE AUTOMATIQUE À DOUBLE VITESSE | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 16.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.12.2018
18.12.2018
ADMISSIBLE SAF-HOLLAND GmbH Hauptstrasse 26 63856 Bessenbach / DE Opponent's representative Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.12.2018
18.12.2018
ADMISSIBLE SAF-HOLLAND GmbH Hauptstrasse 26 63856 Bessenbach / DE Opponent's representative Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | 08.01.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.05.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.03.2020 | 19.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2020 | 19.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.06.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 20.01.2022 | Appeal received No. T0088/22 | 20.01.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 24.03.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.06.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 24.06.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 12.01.2022 | Appeal received No. T0088/22 | 12.01.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 23.03.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.04.2024 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M01) [2024/16] | 19.06.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 24.06.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2013 | AL | 14.03.2018 | AT | 14.03.2018 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | IT | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MK | 14.03.2018 | NL | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | RS | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | SM | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | IE | 04.12.2018 | LU | 04.12.2018 | MT | 04.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | GB | 04.12.2020 | TR | 04.12.2020 | ES | 05.12.2020 | SE | 05.12.2020 | FR | 31.12.2020 | IS | 22.12.2021 | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/23] | HU | 04.12.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
MT | 04.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
GB | 04.12.2020 | ||
ES | 05.12.2020 | ||
SE | 05.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | HU | 04.12.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
MT | 04.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
GB | 04.12.2020 | ||
SE | 05.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HU | 04.12.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
MT | 04.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
GB | 04.12.2020 | ||
SE | 05.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | HU | 04.12.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
MT | 04.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | HU | 04.12.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
MT | 04.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.12.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
MT | 04.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
MT | 04.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 04.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | EP2233376 [ ] | [X]EP2233376 (XIAMEN AUSTIN-WESTRAN MACHINERY CO., LTD.) | [Y]US5118082 (BYUN, DAE-SOO) | [A]WO2012072389 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG. & CO., KG.) | [A]US2012037862 (MCCARTHY ET AL.) | [A]US3927863 (POLSKY, GEORGE) | Opposition | US2391333 | US2464890 | US2659249 | US3135135 | US3244401 | US3458173 | US5118082 | DE19721581 | KR20000015046 | US2004159827 | DE102005036139 | EP2233376 |